EP1379888 - RF TRANSMIT CALIBRATION FOR OPEN MRI SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2011 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.06.2011 [2011/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | For all designated states Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc. 595 Miner Road Cleveland, Ohio 44143 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/03] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For all designated states Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc. 595 Miner Road Cleveland, Ohio 44143 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEMEESTER, Gordon, D. 30175 Overlook Drive Wickliffe, OH 44092 / US | 02 /
BURL, Michael us2 Hawthrone Drive Chargin Falls, OH 44022 / US | 03 /
MORICH, Michael, A. 7580 Jeremy Avenue Mentor, OH 44060 / US | [2004/03] | Representative(s) | Damen, Daniel Martijn, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/26] | Damen, Daniel Martijn, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2004/03] | van der Veer, Johannis Leendert, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 02762012.9 | 09.04.2002 | [2004/03] | WO2002US10969 | Priority number, date | US20010833003 | 11.04.2001 Original published format: US 833003 | [2004/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02084317 | Date: | 24.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1379888 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/36, G01R33/58 | [2004/03] | CPC: |
G01R33/583 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/03] | Title | German: | HF-SENDEKALIBRATION FÜR OPEN-MRI-SYSTEME | [2004/03] | English: | RF TRANSMIT CALIBRATION FOR OPEN MRI SYSTEMS | [2004/03] | French: | CALIBRAGE D'EMISSION HF POUR SYSTEMES D'IRM OUVERTS | [2004/03] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/03] | 13.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/24] | 17.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS6195237 ; | [XA]US5986455 (MAGNUSON ERIK E [US]) [X] 11,13 * column 7, line 27 - line 66 * [A] 1,7,15-17; | [X]US4886386 (PAFFHAUSEN HANS [US], et al) [X] 11-14 * column 3, line 18 - line 37; figure 1; claims 1-4 *; | [A]EP0608426 (YOKOGAWA MEDICAL SYST [JP]) [A] 1-17 * page 3, line 3 - line 47 * * page 4, line 48 - line 53; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0414474 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-17 * column 9, line 32 - column 14, line 33 *; | [A]JPH0351038 ; | [A]US5986454 (LEIFER MARK CURTIS [US]) [A] * column 7, line 63 - column 8, line 9 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860916), vol. 010, no. 271, Database accession no. (P - 497), & JP61095237 A 19860514 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 11-14 * abstract * | [A] - HOULT D I ET AL, "ELIMINATION OF SIGNAL STRENGTH DEPENDENCY UPON COIL LOADING-AN AID TO METABOLITE QUANTITATION WHEN THE SAMPLE VOLUME CHANGES", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, ACADEMIC PRESS, DULUTH, MN, US, (19901201), vol. 16, no. 3, ISSN 0740-3194, pages 418 - 424, XP000145557 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910517), vol. 015, no. 193, Database accession no. (C - 0832), & JP03051038 A 19910305 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1,11,16 * abstract * | Examination | EP1189071 |