EP1553824 - ISOLATED HUMAN RAS-LIKE PROTEINS, NUCLEIC ACID MOLECULES ENCODING THESE HUMAN RAS-LIKE PROTEINS, AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.02.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Change - applicant | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applera Corporation 301 Merritt 7 Norwalk, Connecticut 06851 / US | [2009/44] |
Former [2005/29] | For all designated states Applera Corporation 301 Merritt 7 Norwalk, CT 06851 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAN, Chunhua 45 West Gude Drive C2-4 21 Rockville, MD 20850 / US | 02 /
KETCHUM, Karen A. 45 West Gude Drive C2-4 21 Rockville, MD 20850 / US | 03 /
BEASLEY, Ellen M. 45 West Gude Drive C2-4 21 Rockville, MD 20850 / US | [2005/29] | Representative(s) | Thomson, Paul Anthony Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/29] | Thomson, Paul Anthony Potts, Kerr & Co., 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead, Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 02762021.0 | 10.04.2002 | [2005/29] | WO2002US11111 | Priority number, date | US20010282460P | 10.04.2001 Original published format: US 282460 P | US20020118328 | 09.04.2002 Original published format: US 118328 | [2005/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02083915 | Date: | 24.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1553824 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A01K67/00, A61K38/00, C07K14/00, C07K16/00, C07H21/04, C12P21/00, G01N27/26, G01N33/53 | [2005/29] | CPC: |
C07K14/82 (EP,US);
C07K14/4722 (EP,US);
A01K2217/05 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2005/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ISOLIERTE MENSCHLICHE, RAS-ÄHNLICHE PROTEINE, DIESE MENSCHLICHEN, RAS-ÄHNLICHEN PROTEINE CODIERENDE NUKLEINSÄUREMOLEKÜLE SOWIE VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2005/29] | English: | ISOLATED HUMAN RAS-LIKE PROTEINS, NUCLEIC ACID MOLECULES ENCODING THESE HUMAN RAS-LIKE PROTEINS, AND USES THEREOF | [2005/29] | French: | PROTEINES HUMAINES ISOLEES DE TYPE RAS, MOLECULES D'ACIDE NUCLEIQUE CODANT LESDITES PROTEINES ET UTILISATIONS ASSOCIEES | [2005/29] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2003 | Search fee paid | 05.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 05.11.2003 | Examination requested [2005/29] | 14.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2006/15] | 24.11.2005 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |