EP1399471 - USE OF DIPEPTIDYL PEPTIDASE IV INHIBITORS AS THERAPEUTICS FOR NEUROLOGICAL DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.2008 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Probiodrug AG Weinbergweg 22 06120 Halle/Saale / DE | [2004/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEMUTH, Hans-Ulrich Hegelstrasse 14 06114 Halle/Saale / DE | 02 /
HOFFMANN, Torsten Körnerstrasse 8 06114 Halle/Saale / DE | 03 /
HEISER, Ulrich Franz-Schubert-Strasse 8 06108 Halle/Saale / DE | 04 /
GLUND, Konrad Rüsternweg 37 06120 Halle/Salle / DE | 05 /
VON HÖRSTEN, Stephan Birkenkamp 1 30900 Wedemark / DE | [2004/13] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann, Matthias, et al Probiodrug AG Weinbergweg 22 06120 Halle/Saale / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/51] | Hoffmann, Matthias, et al Probiodrug AG Weinbergweg 22 06120 Halle/Saale / DE | ||
Former [2004/13] | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, Dr. rer. nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Boeters & Bauer, Bereiteranger 15 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02762309.9 | 27.06.2002 | [2004/13] | WO2002EP07133 | Priority number, date | EP20010114796 | 27.06.2001 Original published format: EP 01114796 | DE20011050203 | 12.10.2001 Original published format: DE 10150203 | DE20011054689 | 09.11.2001 Original published format: DE 10154689 | US20020360909P | 28.02.2002 Original published format: US 360909 P | [2004/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03002596 | Date: | 09.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1399471 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1399471 | Date: | 30.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/08, A61K38/04, A61K38/08, A61P25/16, A61P25/28, A61P25/06, A61P25/00 | [2004/13] | CPC: |
C07D295/185 (EP);
A61K38/08 (EP,US);
A61K38/04 (EP);
A61K38/06 (EP);
A61K38/07 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07D207/04 (EP);
C07D277/04 (EP);
C07K5/0806 (EP);
C07K5/0808 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON DPIV-INHIBITOREN ALS THERAPEUTIKA FÜR KRANKHAFTE NEUROLOGISCHE ZUSTÄNDE | [2004/13] | English: | USE OF DIPEPTIDYL PEPTIDASE IV INHIBITORS AS THERAPEUTICS FOR NEUROLOGICAL DISORDERS | [2004/13] | French: | UTILISATION D'INHIBITEURS DE LA DIPEPTIDYL PEPTIDASE IV COMME AGENTS POUR LA THERAPIE DES MALADIES NEUROLOGIQUES | [2004/13] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2003 | Examination requested [2004/13] | 10.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.01.2008 | BE | 30.01.2008 | CH | 30.01.2008 | CY | 30.01.2008 | DK | 30.01.2008 | FI | 30.01.2008 | IT | 30.01.2008 | LI | 30.01.2008 | NL | 30.01.2008 | TR | 30.01.2008 | SE | 30.04.2008 | DE | 01.05.2008 | GR | 01.05.2008 | ES | 11.05.2008 | GB | 27.06.2008 | IE | 27.06.2008 | LU | 27.06.2008 | MC | 30.06.2008 | PT | 30.06.2008 | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 30.01.2008 | |
BE | 30.01.2008 | ||
CH | 30.01.2008 | ||
CY | 30.01.2008 | ||
DK | 30.01.2008 | ||
FI | 30.01.2008 | ||
IT | 30.01.2008 | ||
LI | 30.01.2008 | ||
NL | 30.01.2008 | ||
TR | 30.01.2008 | ||
SE | 30.04.2008 | ||
DE | 01.05.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
GB | 27.06.2008 | ||
IE | 27.06.2008 | ||
LU | 27.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 30.01.2008 | |
BE | 30.01.2008 | ||
CH | 30.01.2008 | ||
CY | 30.01.2008 | ||
DK | 30.01.2008 | ||
FI | 30.01.2008 | ||
IT | 30.01.2008 | ||
LI | 30.01.2008 | ||
NL | 30.01.2008 | ||
SE | 30.04.2008 | ||
DE | 01.05.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
GB | 27.06.2008 | ||
IE | 27.06.2008 | ||
LU | 27.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 30.01.2008 | |
BE | 30.01.2008 | ||
CH | 30.01.2008 | ||
CY | 30.01.2008 | ||
DK | 30.01.2008 | ||
FI | 30.01.2008 | ||
IT | 30.01.2008 | ||
LI | 30.01.2008 | ||
NL | 30.01.2008 | ||
SE | 30.04.2008 | ||
DE | 01.05.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
GB | 27.06.2008 | ||
IE | 27.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 30.01.2008 | |
BE | 30.01.2008 | ||
CH | 30.01.2008 | ||
CY | 30.01.2008 | ||
DK | 30.01.2008 | ||
FI | 30.01.2008 | ||
LI | 30.01.2008 | ||
NL | 30.01.2008 | ||
SE | 30.04.2008 | ||
DE | 01.05.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
GB | 27.06.2008 | ||
IE | 27.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 30.01.2008 | |
BE | 30.01.2008 | ||
CH | 30.01.2008 | ||
DK | 30.01.2008 | ||
FI | 30.01.2008 | ||
LI | 30.01.2008 | ||
NL | 30.01.2008 | ||
SE | 30.04.2008 | ||
DE | 01.05.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
GB | 27.06.2008 | ||
IE | 27.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 30.01.2008 | |
BE | 30.01.2008 | ||
CH | 30.01.2008 | ||
DK | 30.01.2008 | ||
FI | 30.01.2008 | ||
LI | 30.01.2008 | ||
NL | 30.01.2008 | ||
SE | 30.04.2008 | ||
DE | 01.05.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
IE | 27.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 30.01.2008 | |
BE | 30.01.2008 | ||
CH | 30.01.2008 | ||
DK | 30.01.2008 | ||
FI | 30.01.2008 | ||
LI | 30.01.2008 | ||
NL | 30.01.2008 | ||
SE | 30.04.2008 | ||
DE | 01.05.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 30.01.2008 | |
BE | 30.01.2008 | ||
CH | 30.01.2008 | ||
DK | 30.01.2008 | ||
FI | 30.01.2008 | ||
LI | 30.01.2008 | ||
NL | 30.01.2008 | ||
SE | 30.04.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 30.01.2008 | |
BE | 30.01.2008 | ||
CH | 30.01.2008 | ||
DK | 30.01.2008 | ||
FI | 30.01.2008 | ||
LI | 30.01.2008 | ||
NL | 30.01.2008 | ||
SE | 30.04.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
PT | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 30.01.2008 | |
BE | 30.01.2008 | ||
CH | 30.01.2008 | ||
DK | 30.01.2008 | ||
FI | 30.01.2008 | ||
LI | 30.01.2008 | ||
SE | 30.04.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
PT | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 30.01.2008 | |
BE | 30.01.2008 | ||
CH | 30.01.2008 | ||
FI | 30.01.2008 | ||
LI | 30.01.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
PT | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 30.01.2008 | |
CH | 30.01.2008 | ||
FI | 30.01.2008 | ||
LI | 30.01.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
PT | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 30.01.2008 | |
CH | 30.01.2008 | ||
FI | 30.01.2008 | ||
LI | 30.01.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CH | 30.01.2008 | |
LI | 30.01.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9962914 (POINT THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [X] 1-5,12,13 * page 20, line 7 - line 12; example -; claim - *; | [X]WO0134594 (GUILFORD PHARM INC [US], et al) [X] 1-5,12,13 * page 7, line 1 - line 8 * * claims 21-30 *; | [PX]WO0189569 (INST MEDIZINTECHNOLOGIE MAGDEB [DE], et al) [PX] 1-5,12,13* claims 5,7-13 *; | [X] - REINHOLD DIRK ET AL, "Inhibitors of dipeptidyl peptidase IV/CD26 suppress activation of human MBP-specific CD4+ T cell clones.", JOURNAL OF NEUROIMMUNOLOGY, (19980701), vol. 87, no. 1-2, ISSN 0165-5728, pages 203 - 209, XP002214116 [X] 1-5,12,13 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0165-5728(98)00100-3 | [A] - STOCKEL-MASCHEK^A A ET AL, "Thioxo amino acid pyrrolidides and thiazolidides: new inhibitors of proline specific peptidases", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA. PROTEIN STRUCTURE AND MOLECULAR ENZYMOLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM,, NL, (20000615), vol. 1479, no. 1-2, ISSN 0167-4838, pages 15 - 31, XP004279023 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-4838(00)00054-6 |