EP1412498 - POLYNUCLEOTIDES EXPRESSED IN DENDRITIC CELLS AND POLYPEPTIDES ENCODED THEREBY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] | Applicant(s) | For:BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
LI
SK
SE
TR
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | For:BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
LI
SK
SE
TR
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CERWENKA, Adelheid Dreikönigsstrasse 1-3 69117 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
KALTHOFF, Frank, Stephan Mödlinger-Strasse 3/6 A-2353 Guntramsdorf / AT | 03 /
PHARES, William, F. Vogesenstrasse 47 4056 Basel / CH | [2004/22] |
Former [2004/18] | 01 /
CERWENKA, Adelheid Stolzenthalergasse 17/22 A-1080 Wien / AT | ||
02 /
KALTHOFF, Frank, Stephan Mödlinger-Strasse 3/6 A-2353 Guntramsdorf / AT | |||
03 /
PHARES, William, F. Vogesenstrasse 47 4056 Basel / CH | Representative(s) | de Weerd, Petrus G.W., et al Novartis International AG Corporate Intellectual Property 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/12] | de Weerd, Petrus G.W., et al Novartis International AG Corporate Intellectual Property 4002 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2004/18] | Grubb, Philip William, et al Novartis AG, Corporate Intellectual Property, Lichtstrasse 35 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 02762366.9 | 16.07.2002 | [2004/18] | WO2002EP07924 | Priority number, date | US20010305932P | 17.07.2001 Original published format: US 305932 P | US20010313550P | 20.08.2001 Original published format: US 313550 P | US20010315123P | 27.08.2001 Original published format: US 315123 P | US20010318484P | 10.09.2001 Original published format: US 318484 P | [2004/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03008579 | Date: | 30.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1412498 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/11, C07K14/47, C07K16/18, C12Q1/68, G01N33/53, G01N33/68, A61K38/16, A61K39/395, A61K31/7088, A61P29/00, A61P37/00, A61P35/00, A61P31/00 | [2004/18] | CPC: |
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
A61P1/06 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYNUKLEOTIDE DIE IN DENDRITISCHE ZELLEN EXPRIMIERT SIND UND DIE DAVON KODIERTEN POLYPEPTIDE | [2004/18] | English: | POLYNUCLEOTIDES EXPRESSED IN DENDRITIC CELLS AND POLYPEPTIDES ENCODED THEREBY | [2004/18] | French: | COMPOSES ORGANIQUES | [2004/18] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/32] | 21.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/13] | 07.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1087012 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2,5-7,18 * the whole document *; | [AD] - BANCHEREAU J & STEINMAN R M, "Dendritic cells and the control of immunity", NATURE, MACMILLAN JOURNALS LTD. LONDON, GB, (19980319), vol. 392, no. 6673, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 245 - 252, XP002134557 [AD] 1,2,5-7,18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/32588 | [DA] - STEINMAN RALPH M ET AL, "Myeloid dendritic cells.", JOURNAL OF LEUKOCYTE BIOLOGY, (199908), vol. 66, no. 2, ISSN 0741-5400, pages 205 - 208, XP008019908 [DA] 1,2,5-7,18 * the whole document * | [XD] - PARK S ET AL, "Characterization of bovine and human cDNAs encoding NAP-22 (22 kDa neuronal tissue-enriched acidic protein) homologs.", MOLECULES AND CELLS. KOREA 31 AUG 1998, (19980831), vol. 8, no. 4, ISSN 1016-8478, pages 471 - 477, XP008019941 [XD] 1,2,5-7,18 * the whole document * | [XD] - MOSEVITSKY M I ET AL, "The BASP1 family of myristoylated proteins abundant in axonal termini. Primary structure analysis and physico-chemical properties.", BIOCHIMIE (PARIS), (1997), vol. 79, no. 6, ISSN 0300-9084, pages 373 - 384, XP002248480 [XD] 1,2,5-7,18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0300-9084(97)80032-6 | [ ] - EMBL, Database accession no. P80723 [ ] * abstract * | [XD] - IINO SATOSHI ET AL, "Immunohistochemical demonstration of a neuronal calmodulin-binding protein, NAP-22, in the rat spinal cord.", BRAIN RESEARCH, (19990710), vol. 834, no. 1-2, ISSN 0006-8993, pages 66 - 73, XP002248481 [XD] 1,2,5-7,18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0006-8993(99)01543-7 | [XD] - EMBL, Database accession no. BC000518, XP002248482 [XD] 1,2,5-7,18 * abstract * | [XD] - EMBL, Database accession no. AF039656, XP002248483 [XD] 1,2,5-7,18 * abstract * | [X] - EMBL, Database accession no. AL523083, XP002248484 [X] 1,2,5-7,18 * abstract * |