EP1409979 - PRESSURE SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Endress + Hauser GmbH + Co. KG Hauptstrasse 1 79689 Maulburg / DE | [2014/24] |
Former [2004/17] | For all designated states Endress + Hauser GmbH + Co.KG. Hauptstrasse 1 79689 Maulburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BANHOLZER, Karl-Heinz Am Sportplatz 6 79688 Hausen / DE | 02 /
GERDES, Bernhard Im Schlattgarten 11 79589 Binzen / DE | [2004/17] | Representative(s) | Andres, Angelika Maria, et al Endress+Hauser Group Services (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG Colmarer Straße 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/24] | Andres, Angelika Maria, et al Endress+Hauser (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG PatServe Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2006/34] | Andres, Angelika Maria, et al Endress+Hauser (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG PatServe Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2004/17] | Andres, Angelika Endress + Hauser (Deutschland) Holding GmbH, Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 02762372.7 | 18.07.2002 | [2004/17] | WO2002EP07976 | Priority number, date | DE20011035568 | 20.07.2001 Original published format: DE 10135568 | [2004/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03014688 | Date: | 20.02.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1409979 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1409979 | Date: | 11.06.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01L9/00 | [2004/17] | CPC: |
G01L19/148 (EP,US);
G01L19/0038 (EP,US);
G01L19/0084 (EP,US);
G01L9/0075 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/17] | Title | German: | DRUCKSENSOR | [2004/17] | English: | PRESSURE SENSOR | [2004/17] | French: | CAPTEUR DE PRESSION | [2004/17] | Entry into regional phase | 24.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 24.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/17] | 16.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 28.04.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 11.06.2014 | CY | 11.06.2014 | CZ | 11.06.2014 | DK | 11.06.2014 | EE | 11.06.2014 | ES | 11.06.2014 | FI | 11.06.2014 | IT | 11.06.2014 | MC | 11.06.2014 | NL | 11.06.2014 | SE | 11.06.2014 | SK | 11.06.2014 | TR | 11.06.2014 | AT | 18.07.2014 | IE | 18.07.2014 | LU | 18.07.2014 | BE | 31.07.2014 | CH | 31.07.2014 | LI | 31.07.2014 | FR | 11.08.2014 | GB | 11.09.2014 | GR | 12.09.2014 | PT | 13.10.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | BG | 11.06.2014 | |
CY | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
AT | 18.07.2014 | ||
IE | 18.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
FR | 11.08.2014 | ||
GB | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | BG | 11.06.2014 | |
CY | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
AT | 18.07.2014 | ||
IE | 18.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
FR | 11.08.2014 | ||
GB | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | BG | 11.06.2014 | |
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
AT | 18.07.2014 | ||
IE | 18.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
FR | 11.08.2014 | ||
GB | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/51] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
AT | 18.07.2014 | ||
IE | 18.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
FR | 11.08.2014 | ||
GB | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
IE | 18.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
FR | 11.08.2014 | ||
GB | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
FR | 11.08.2014 | ||
GB | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/25] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
FR | 11.08.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | FI | 11.06.2014 | |
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | FI | 11.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0570624 (FUJI KOKI MFG [JP]) [X] 1,3,4,7-9 * column 8, line 18 - column 10, line 29 * * figure 4 * [Y] 2,5,6; | [X]US5051937 (KAWATE KEITH W [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 43 * * figure 2 *; | [Y]JPH1172400 ; | [Y]JPH07198515 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990630), vol. 1999, no. 08, & JP11072400 A 19990316 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [Y] 5,6 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951226), vol. 1995, no. 11, & JP07198515 A 19950801 (OMRON CORP) [Y] 2 * abstract * |