EP1432643 - SHORT CARBON NANOTUBES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rosseter Holdings Limited 4 Niciforou Lytra, P.O. Box 56860 Limassol 3310 / CY | [2004/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RYZHKOV, Vladislav Andreevitch Emmanuel Roidi Street Kirzis Center, Flat DM1 3310 Limassol / CY | [2004/27] | Representative(s) | Ouzman, Beverley Nicola Claire, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Ouzman, Beverley Nicola Claire, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2004/27] | Ouzman, Beverley Nicola Claire, et al Murgitroyd and Company, 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 02762594.6 | 30.09.2002 | [2004/27] | WO2002GB04404 | Priority number, date | GB20010023508 | 01.10.2001 Original published format: GB 0123508 | GB20020006442 | 19.03.2002 Original published format: GB 0206442 | [2004/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03029141 | Date: | 10.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1432643 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C01B31/02 | [2004/27] | CPC: |
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
B82B1/00 (KR);
C01B32/166 (EP,US);
B01J19/088 (EP,US);
B82B3/00 (KR);
B82Y40/00 (EP,US);
C01B23/00 (EP,US);
C01B3/0021 (EP,US);
F17C11/00 (EP,US);
F17C11/005 (EP,US);
F17C11/007 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00087 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0809 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0828 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0839 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0871 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0875 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0877 (EP,US);
B82Y10/00 (KR);
C01B2202/02 (EP,US);
C01B2202/34 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KURZE KOHLENSTOFF-NANORÖHREN | [2004/27] | English: | SHORT CARBON NANOTUBES | [2004/27] | French: | NANOTUBES DE CARBONE COURTS | [2004/27] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/27] | 02.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/22] | 16.04.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.06.2009 | 19.06.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.06.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2006 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   22.01.2007 | 30.09.2008 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   04.12.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9965821 (UNIV NEW YORK STATE RES FOUND [US]) [X] 5 * page 7, line 22 - line 28 * * page 9, line 19 - line 22 *; | [X]EP1022763 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5 * paragraph [0020] *; | [X]WO0116023 (ULTRATEC LTD [GB], et al) [X] 5,7 * page 15, line 1 - line 16 *; | [X]EP1129990 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 5 * claims 11,12 *; | [X] - KIANG C-H ET AL, "CARBON NANOTUBES WITH SINGLE-LAYER WALLS", CARBON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHING, NEW YORK, NY, US, (199508), ISSN 0008-6223, pages 903 - 914, XP002914569 [X] 1-4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0008-6223(95)00019-A | [X] - P. NIKOLAEV ET AL., "Diameter Doubling of single-wall nanotubes", CHEMICAL PHYSICS LETTERS, (19970307), vol. 266, pages 422 - 426, XP002226764 [X] 1,4 * "Results";; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0009-2614(97)00053-5 | [X] - CHENG H M ET AL, "BULK MORPHOLOGY AND DIAMETER DISTRIBUTION OF SINGLE-WALLED CARBON NANOTUBES SYNTHESIZED BY CATALYTIC DECOMPOSITION OF HYDROCARBONS", CHEMICAL PHYSICS LETTERS, NORTH-HOLLAND, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1998), vol. 289, ISSN 0009-2614, pages 602 - 610, XP000964984 [X] 1,4 * "Diameter distributionof the SWNTs";; figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0009-2614(98)00479-5 | [X] - SERAPHIN S ET AL, "SINGLE-WALLED CARBON NANOTUBES PRODUCED AT HIGH YIELD BY MIXED CATALYSTS", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (19940418), vol. 64, no. 16, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 2087 - 2089, XP000440697 [X] 1,4 * column 1; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.111691 | [A] - ZHOU D ET AL, "SINGLE-WALLED CARBON NANOTUBES GROWING RADIALLY FROM YC2 PARTICLES", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (19940919), vol. 65, no. 12, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 1593 - 1595, XP000470288 [A] 1-4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.112924 | [A] - LIU J ET AL, "FULLERENE PIPES", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE,, US, (19980522), vol. 280, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1253 - 1256, XP000960737 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.280.5367.1253 |