EP1433000 - GPS RECEIVER AND RELATED METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.07.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2007/31] |
Former [2004/27] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CASWELL, Anne, C. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
DOOLEY, Saul, R. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2004/27] | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew, et al NXP SEMICONDUCTORS UK LTD Intellectual Property & Licensing Red Central 60 High Street Redhill, Surrey RH1 1SH / GB | [2014/09] |
Former [2009/09] | Williamson, Paul Lewis, et al NXP Semiconductors UK Ltd. Intellectual Property Department Betchworth House Station Road Redhill Surrey RH1 1DL / GB | ||
Former [2007/01] | White, Andrew Gordon, et al NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2004/27] | White, Andrew G. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards, Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02762707.4 | 10.09.2002 | [2004/27] | WO2002IB03687 | Priority number, date | GB20010022228 | 13.09.2001 Original published format: GB 0122228 | [2004/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03023442 | Date: | 20.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1433000 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/14 | [2004/27] | CPC: |
G01S19/25 (EP,US);
G01S19/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/27] | Title | German: | GPS-EMPFÄNGER UND VERFAHREN | [2004/27] | English: | GPS RECEIVER AND RELATED METHOD | [2004/27] | French: | RECEPTEUR GPS ET PROCEDE ASSOCIE | [2004/27] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/52] | 20.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/36] | 30.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.01.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6070078 (CAMP JR WILLIAM O [US], et al) [A] 12 * abstract * * column 1, line 6 - line 43 ** column 7, line 16 - line 41 *; | [YA]WO0045191 (SNAPTRACK INC [US]) [Y] 5 * abstract * * page 13, paragraph 3 - page 15, paragraph 1 * * page 16, paragraph 4 - page 17, paragraph 1 * [A] 3,8-10,12; | [AD]US6133873 (KRASNER NORMAN F [US]) [AD] 1,3,4,13 * abstract * * column 3, line 34 - line 40 * * column 12, line 61 - column 13, line 13 * * column 14, line 21 - column 16, line 15 *; | [XAY]EP1083440 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1,2,6,7,11,13,14 * abstract * * column 3, line 1 - line 41 * * column 5, line 11 - line 38 * * column 7, line 4 - line 53 * [A] 9 [Y] 5 |