EP1429427 - TRANSMISSION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states J.S.T. Mfg. Co., Ltd. 4-8 Minamisenba 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-0081 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/25] | For all designated states J.S.T. Mfg. Co., Ltd. 4-8 Minamisenba 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-0081 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHIRAN, KIYOHIKO, J.S.T. Mfg. Co., Ltd. 1099-25, Aza-Marune, Oaza-Kurozasa, Miyoshi-cho Nishikamo-gun, Aichi 470-0201 / JP | 02 /
SUYAMA, TAKASHI, J.S.T. Mfg. Co., Ltd. 9-23, Takejima 3-chome, Nishiyodogawa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 555-0011 / JP | [2004/25] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | ||
Former [2004/25] | W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Coopers Building, Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 02763027.6 | 13.09.2002 | [2004/25] | WO2002JP09413 | Priority number, date | JP20010281917 | 17.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001281917 | [2004/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03026077 | Date: | 27.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1429427 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.03.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/648 | [2004/25] | CPC: |
H01R13/6582 (EP,US);
H01R13/648 (KR);
H01R13/6592 (EP,US);
H01R13/748 (EP,US);
Y10S439/939 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/25] | Title | German: | ÜBERTRAGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2004/25] | English: | TRANSMISSION APPARATUS | [2004/25] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRANSMISSION | [2004/25] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2004 | Translation filed | 26.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2004 | Search fee paid | 26.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 26.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/25] | 17.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/43] | 09.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.02.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6231385 (KUO PETER [TW]) [A] 1* column 2, line 53 - column 4, line 6 * | International search | [X]JPH06132690 (FUJITSU LTD); | [Y]JPH09213420 (JAPAN AVIATION ELECTRON); | [Y]US5971811 (MORI SHIGEO [JP], et al); | [A]JP2580724Y ; | [A]JPH0329895Y |