EP1425566 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SAMPLE PREPARATION USING SOLID PHASE MICROEXTRACTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SGE Analytical Science Pty Ltd 7 Argent Place Ringwood VIC 3134 / AU | [2007/32] |
Former [2004/24] | For all designated states AstraZeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABDEL-REHIM, Mohamed AstraZeneca R & D Södertälje S-151 85 Södertälje / SE | [2004/24] | Representative(s) | Hamer, Christopher K. Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Hamer, Christopher K. Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2007/48] | Hamer, Christopher K. Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02763157.1 | 28.08.2002 | [2004/24] | WO2002SE01543 | Priority number, date | SE20010002922 | 31.08.2001 Original published format: SE 0102922 | [2004/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03019149 | Date: | 06.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1425566 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1425566 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 06.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/40 | [2004/24] | CPC: |
B01L3/0217 (EP,US);
G01N1/40 (EP,US);
B01L2200/0631 (EP,US);
G01N1/405 (EP,US);
G01N2030/009 (EP,US);
Y10T436/25375 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR PROBENVORBEREITUNG MIT FESTPHASEN-MIKROEXTRAKTION | [2004/24] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SAMPLE PREPARATION USING SOLID PHASE MICROEXTRACTION | [2004/24] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE PREPARATION D'UN ECHANTILLON PAR MICROEXTRACTION SUR PHASE SOLIDE | [2004/24] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 31.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/24] | 18.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.11.2009 | BE | 25.11.2009 | CY | 25.11.2009 | CZ | 25.11.2009 | DK | 25.11.2009 | EE | 25.11.2009 | FI | 25.11.2009 | IT | 25.11.2009 | NL | 25.11.2009 | SE | 25.11.2009 | SK | 25.11.2009 | TR | 25.11.2009 | BG | 25.02.2010 | GR | 26.02.2010 | ES | 08.03.2010 | PT | 25.03.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2011/14] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
IT | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
GR | 26.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
SK | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
DK | 25.11.2009 | ||
EE | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
BG | 25.02.2010 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
NL | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
ES | 08.03.2010 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/31] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 25.11.2009 | ||
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 25.11.2009 | |
CY | 25.11.2009 | ||
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 25.11.2009 | |
FI | 25.11.2009 | ||
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 25.11.2009 | |
SE | 25.11.2009 | ||
PT | 25.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5565622 (MURPHY GREGORY E [US]); | [A]US6164144 (BERG JOHN R [US]) |