EP1414471 - Therapeutic agents comprising pro-apoptotic proteins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/19] | THERAPEUTIC AGENTS COMPRISING PRO-APOPTOTIC PROTEINS | ||
[2012/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT FOUNDATION 402 North Division Street Carson City, Nevada 89703 / US | [2012/24] |
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT FOUNDATION 402 North Division Street Carson City, Nevada 89703 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSENBLUM, Michael, G. 3127 Stoney Mist Drive Sugar Land, TX 77479 / US | 02 /
LIU, Yuying 4045 Linkwood Drive Apt.331 Houston, TX 77025 / US | [2012/24] |
Former [2004/19] | 01 /
ROSENBLUM, Michael, G. 3127 Stoney Mist Drive Sugar Land, TX 77479 / US | ||
02 /
LIU, Yuying 4045 Linkwood Drive, Apt.331 Houston, TX 77025 / US | Representative(s) | Campbell, Joanne Marie Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/20] | Heaton, Joanne Marie Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | ||
Former [2012/24] | McQueen, Andrew Peter, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | ||
Former [2005/21] | McQueen, Andrew Peter, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | ||
Former [2004/19] | Wilkinson, Stephen John Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 02763328.8 | 17.07.2002 | [2004/19] | WO2002US23378 | Priority number, date | US20010306091P | 17.07.2001 Original published format: US 306091 P | US20010332886P | 06.11.2001 Original published format: US 332886 P | US20020360361P | 28.02.2002 Original published format: US 360361 P | [2004/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03007889 | Date: | 30.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1414471 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1414471 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/62, C12N9/64, C07K14/47, A61P35/00 | [2012/03] | CPC: |
C12N9/6467 (EP,US);
C07K14/52 (EP,KR,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07K14/4747 (EP,US);
C07K14/715 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2004/19] | A61K31/70, C07H21/04, C12N15/12, C12P19/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/19] | Title | German: | Therapeutische Mittel mit pro-apoptotischen Proteinen | [2012/03] | English: | Therapeutic agents comprising pro-apoptotic proteins | [2012/03] | French: | Agents thérapeutiques contenant des protéines pro-apoptotiques | [2012/03] |
Former [2004/19] | THERAPEUTISCHE MITTEL MIT PRO-APOPTOTISCHEN PROTEINEN | ||
Former [2004/19] | THERAPEUTIC AGENTS COMPRISING PRO-APOPTOTIC PROTEINS | ||
Former [2004/19] | AGENTS THERAPEUTIQUES CONTENANT DES PROTEINES PRO-APOPTOTIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2004 | Search fee paid | 16.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/19] | 18.03.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.12.2008 | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.06.2012 | BE | 13.06.2012 | CY | 13.06.2012 | CZ | 13.06.2012 | EE | 13.06.2012 | FI | 13.06.2012 | IT | 13.06.2012 | SK | 13.06.2012 | TR | 13.06.2012 | LU | 17.07.2012 | MC | 31.07.2012 | BG | 13.09.2012 | GR | 14.09.2012 | ES | 24.09.2012 | PT | 15.10.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
TR | 13.06.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 13.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]WO9746259 (YISSUM RES DEV CO [IL], et al) [XD] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9943840 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA [US]) [X] 1-15,18,22-38,45-49,56,58,59 * page 28, line 6 *; | [X] - ARORA N ET AL, "Vascular endothelial growth factor chimeric toxin is highly active against endothelial cells", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (19990101), vol. 59, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 183 - 188, XP002271436 [X] 1 * the whole document * | [T] - LIU YUYING ET AL, "Mechanistic studies of a novel human fusion toxin composed of vascular endothelial growth factor (VEGF)121 and the serine protease granzyme B: directed apoptotic events in vascular endothelial cells.", MOLECULAR CANCER THERAPEUTICS. OCT 2003, (200310), vol. 2, no. 10, ISSN 1535-7163, pages 949 - 959, XP002333236 [T] 1-40,45-51,56-59 * the whole document * | International search | [X]WO9837901 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA [US], et al) | Examination | WO9945128 | by applicant | - ZUNINO SJ; BLEACKLEY RC; MARTINEZ J; HUDIG D, "RNKP-1, a novel natural killer cell-associated serine protease gene cloned from RNK-16 cytotoxic lymphocytes", J IMMUNOL, (1990), vol. 144, pages 2001 - 2009 |