EP1432876 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TOWING A SHELLFISH DREDGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.10.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.11.2006 [2006/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Myers, Arthur R. Jr 2637 Pamlico Loop Virginia Beach, VA 23456 / US | [2004/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/27] | Representative(s) | Donné, Eddy Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv. Arenbergstraat 13 2000 Antwerpen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/27] | Donné, Eddy M.F.J.Bockstael Arenbergstraat 13 2000 Anvers / BE | Application number, filing date | 02763669.5 | 02.10.2002 | [2004/27] | WO2002US29834 | Priority number, date | US20010968533 | 02.10.2001 Original published format: US 968533 | [2004/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03029566 | Date: | 10.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1432876 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B63B21/04, A01K80/00 | [2006/20] | CPC: |
B63B21/66 (EP,US);
A01K80/00 (EP,US);
E02F3/8875 (EP,US);
B63B35/14 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/43] | B63B21/04 | ||
Former IPC [2004/27] | E02F1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM ZIEHEN EINER SCHLEPPVORRICHTUNG FÜR SCHALTIERE | [2004/27] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TOWING A SHELLFISH DREDGE | [2004/27] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR LE REMORQUAGE DE DRAGUE A MOLLUSQUES ET CRUSTACES | [2004/27] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2003 | Search fee paid | 26.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2003 | Examination requested [2004/27] | 03.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/46] | 28.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3608217 (VOISIN CHARLES J SR) [Y] 4,5 * column 6, lines 19-59 * * figures 1,7 *; | [X]US3672322 (LINDE HAROLD E VAN DER) [X] 1,3,6,10,11 * column 3, lines 51-66 * * figure 5 *; | [X]US4080920 (BERTHET JEAN-PIERRE, et al) [X] 1,3,6,10,11 * column 1, lines 21-42 * * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 38 * * column 4, lines 1-29 ** figures 1,2 *; | [XDY]US4464851 (COLLIER JOHN A [US]) [XD] 1,2,6-13 * column 6, lines 16-57 * * figure 1 * [Y] 4,5 | International search | [X]US4270479 (BAKER JUDD O, et al); | [Y]US753168 | by applicant | US6237259 | US2508087 | US3184866 | US3462858 | US3521386 | US3624932 | US4464851 | GB1115547 |