EP1451011 - AUTODEPOSITION COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2004/36] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WELLER, Christopher, G. 1305 N. Wilson Avenue Royal Oak, MI 48067 / US | 02 /
SIEBERT, Elizabeth, J. 1351 Cedar Birmingham, MI 48009 / US | 03 /
YANG, Zhiqi 2395 Sweet Drive Troy, MI 48098 / US | 04 /
AGARWAL, Rajat, K. 4774 Pine Eagles Drive Brighton, MI 48116 / US | 05 /
FRISTAD, William, E. 3724 Newcastle Drive Rochester Hills, MI 48306 / US | 06 /
BAMMEL, Brian, D. 447 Parkland Drive Rochester Hills, MI 48307 / US | [2004/36] | Representative(s) | Scheffler, Ingolf, et al Henkel AG & Co. KGaA VTP Patente 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/36] | Scheffler, Ingolf, et al Henkel KGaA Patente (VTP) 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 02763714.9 | 25.09.2002 | [2004/36] | WO2002US30332 | Priority number, date | US20010964181 | 25.09.2001 Original published format: US 964181 | [2004/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03026888 | Date: | 03.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1451011 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1451011 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.04.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/28, B32B27/30, B32B15/08, B05D3/00, B05D3/02, C08L63/00, C08F8/30, C09D5/08 | [2005/18] | CPC: |
C09D5/088 (EP,US);
C09D163/00 (EP,KR,US);
B05D3/0254 (EP,US);
B05D7/142 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31511 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31522 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C09D163/00, C08L2666/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/36] | B32B27/28, B32B27/30, B32B15/08, B05D3/00, B05D3/02, C08L63/00, C08F8/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SELBSTABSCHEIDENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2004/36] | English: | AUTODEPOSITION COMPOSITIONS | [2004/36] | French: | COMPOSITIONS A AUTODEPOSITION | [2004/36] | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 02.04.2004 | Search fee paid | 02.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 13.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.12.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.10.2010 | BE | 27.10.2010 | CY | 27.10.2010 | CZ | 27.10.2010 | DK | 27.10.2010 | EE | 27.10.2010 | FI | 27.10.2010 | IT | 27.10.2010 | NL | 27.10.2010 | SE | 27.10.2010 | SK | 27.10.2010 | TR | 27.10.2010 | BG | 27.01.2011 | GR | 28.01.2011 | ES | 07.02.2011 | PT | 28.02.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/26] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
BE | 27.10.2010 | ||
CY | 27.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2010 | ||
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
IT | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
BE | 27.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2010 | ||
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
IT | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
BE | 27.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2010 | ||
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
BE | 27.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
BE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | FI | 27.10.2010 | |
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0037750 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) [Y] 1-19 * page 4, line 21 - page 5, line 20 * * page 5, line 34 - page 6, line 31 * * page 7, line 39 - page 8, line 29; claims 1-12 *; | [A]WO9637554 (HENKEL CORP [US], et al) [A] 1* page 6, line 27 - page 8, line 16; claims 1-17 *; | [Y]US5824424 (HANEISHI HIDEHIKO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-19 * column 1, line 35 - line 58 * * column 4, line 37 - column 5 * * column 7, line 13 - line 64 * * column 8, line 58 - column 10, line 16; claims 1-18 *; | [DY]US6096806 (MUELLER BRIAN L [US], et al) [DY] 1-19 * column 10, line 17 - column 11, line 44; claims 1-20 * | International search | [A]US5472999 (KUDOH MASANOBU [JP], et al); | [X]US5824424 (HANEISHI HIDEHIKO [JP], et al); | [A]US6096806 (MUELLER BRIAN L [US], et al); | [XP]US2002011309 (AGARWAL RAJAT K [US], et al); | [XP]US2002102356 (AGARWAL RAJAT K [US], et al) |