EP1392484 - HIGH THROUGHPUT SCREENING OF CRYSTALIZATION OF MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CALIFORNIA INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY 1200 East California Boulevard Pasadena, CA 92115 / US | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/16] | For all designated states CALIFORNIA INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY 1200 East California Boulevard Pasadena, CA 92115 / US | ||
For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US | |||
Former [2004/10] | For all designated states California Institute of Technology 1200 East California Boulevard Pasadena, California 92115 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANSEN, Carl, L. 937 East California Blvd., 7 Pasadena, CA 91106 / US | 02 /
QUAKE, Stephen, R. 744 Plymouth Road San Marino, CA 91108 / US | 03 /
BERGER, James, M. 47 Arlington Court Kensington, CA 94707 / US | [2007/32] |
Former [2004/18] | 01 /
HANSEN, Carl, L. 937 East California Blvd., #7 Pasadena, CA 91106 / US | ||
02 /
QUAKE, Stephen, R. 744 Plymouth Road San Marino, CA 91108 / US | |||
03 /
BERGER, James, M. 47 Arlington Court Kensington, CA 94707 / US | |||
Former [2004/10] | 01 /
HANSEN, Carl, L. 438 S. Catalina 204 Pasadena, CA 91106 / US | ||
02 /
QUAKE, Stephen, R. 744 Plymouth Road San Marino, CA 91108 / US | |||
03 /
BERGER, James, M. 47 Arlington Court Kensington, CA 94707 / US | Representative(s) | Bizley, Richard Edward, et al Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 J J Thomson Ave Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/24] | Bizley, Richard Edward, et al avidity IP Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | ||
Former [2009/45] | Bizley, Richard Edward, et al HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | ||
Former [2004/10] | Bizley, Richard Edward, et al Hepworth, Lawrence, Bryer & Bizley Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02763974.9 | 05.04.2002 | [2004/10] | WO2002US10875 | Priority number, date | US20010826583 | 06.04.2001 Original published format: US 826583 | US20010887997 | 22.06.2001 Original published format: US 887997 | US20010323524P | 17.09.2001 Original published format: US 323524 P | [2004/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02082047 | Date: | 17.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1392484 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1392484 | Date: | 12.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.12.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/06, B01L9/00, B01L3/00 | [2012/40] | CPC: |
B01L3/502738 (EP);
B01L3/06 (EP);
B01L9/527 (EP);
C30B7/00 (EP);
B01J2219/00274 (EP);
B01L2200/025 (EP);
B01L2200/027 (EP);
B01L2200/0605 (EP);
B01L2200/10 (EP);
B01L2300/0681 (EP);
B01L2300/0861 (EP);
B01L2300/123 (EP);
B01L2300/14 (EP);
B01L2300/18 (EP);
B01L2400/0481 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2004/30] | B01L3/00, B81B1/00, C30B7/00, C30B29/58 | ||
Former IPC [2004/10] | B29C39/00, B29C45/00, C30B35/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/10] | Title | German: | SCREENING DER KRISTALLISIERUNG VON MATERIALIEN MIT HOHEM DURCHSATZ | [2004/10] | English: | HIGH THROUGHPUT SCREENING OF CRYSTALIZATION OF MATERIALS | [2004/10] | French: | CRIBLAGE A HAUT RENDEMENT DE LA CRISTALLISATION DE MATERIAUX | [2004/10] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2003 | Search fee paid | 31.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.11.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 15.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.04.2005 | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/21] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 16.05.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 16.05.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.06.2008 | Decision despatched | 30.03.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 30.03.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.04.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2006 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   28.06.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.06.2013 | BE | 12.06.2013 | CY | 12.06.2013 | DK | 12.06.2013 | FI | 12.06.2013 | IT | 12.06.2013 | TR | 12.06.2013 | GR | 13.09.2013 | ES | 23.09.2013 | PT | 14.10.2013 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/31] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CY | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | BE | 12.06.2013 | |
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 12.06.2013 | |
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | ES | 23.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4948564 (ROOT DAVID [US], et al) [A] 12 * abstract *; | [A]WO9900655 (IMMUNETICS [US]) [A] 12 * page 3, line 24 - page 5, line 20 *; | [X]US5932100 (YAGER PAUL [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, line 19 - column 5, line 48 *; | [A]WO9952633 (LUMENAL TECHNOLOGIES L P [US]) [A] 12,17 * page 7 - page 8; claim 44 *; | [A]WO0043748 (YSI INC [US]) [A] 18,19,21 * page 5, line 24 - page 7, line 5 *; | [A] - LUFT J R ET AL, "Microbatch macromolecular crystallization in micropipettes - Structure, Function and Genetics", JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH, NORTH-HOLLAND PUBLISHING CO. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19990115), vol. 196, no. 2-4, ISSN 0022-0248, pages 450 - 455, XP004154381 [A] 2 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-0248(98)00864-1 | [A] - SANJOH A ET AL, "Spatiotemporal protein crystal growth studies using microfluidic silicon devices", JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH, NORTH-HOLLAND PUBLISHING CO. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19990115), vol. 196, no. 2-4, ISSN 0022-0248, pages 691 - 702, XP004154402 [A] 2 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-0248(98)00821-5 | [A] - DUFFY ET AL, "Rapid Prototyping of Microfluidic Systems in Poly(dimethylsiloxane)", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. COLUMBUS, US, (1998), vol. 70, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 4974 - 4984, XP002149044 [A] 22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac980656z | International search | [Y]US5842787 ; | [Y]US5942443 ; | [Y]US5423287 | by applicant | - DUFFY ET AL., "Rapid Prototyping of Micro fluidic Systems in Poly (dimethylsiloxane)", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (1998), vol. 70, pages 4974 - 4984 |