EP1405163 - USER INTERFACE AND MEANS FOR CONTROLLING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.09.2010 [2010/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wellton-Persson, Claes Lorentz Uno Sveavägen 118, 5 tr. 113 50 Stockholm / SE | [2004/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/15] | Representative(s) | Stein, Jan, et al Groth & Co. KB P.O. Box 6107 102 32 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/10] | Stein, Jan Anders Lennart, et al Groth & Co. KB P.O. Box 6107 102 32 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2004/15] | Norén, Per Bo Arne SWEDPATENT AB P.O. Box 186 746 24 Balsta / SE | Application number, filing date | 02764130.7 | 24.04.2002 | [2004/15] | WO2002SE00817 | Priority number, date | SE20010001489 | 25.04.2001 Original published format: SE 0101489 | [2004/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02086692 | Date: | 31.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1405163 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 31.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/02 | [2004/15] | CPC: |
G06F3/0489 (EP,US);
G06F3/0482 (EP,US);
H04N21/41265 (EP,US);
H04N21/422 (EP,US);
H04N21/42204 (EP,US);
H04N21/4532 (EP,US);
H04N21/4622 (EP,US);
H04N21/47 (EP,US);
H04N21/4786 (EP,US);
H04N21/482 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BENUTZEROBERFLÄCHE UND MITTEL ZU IHRER STEUERUNG | [2004/15] | English: | USER INTERFACE AND MEANS FOR CONTROLLING SAME | [2004/15] | French: | INTERFACE UTILISATEUR ET ORGANE DE COMMANDE DE CELLE-CI | [2004/15] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 26.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 26.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/35] | 14.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.12.2003 | AT   M02   Fee paid on   26.01.2004 | 29.12.2003 | BE   M02   Fee paid on   26.01.2004 | 29.12.2003 | CH   M02   Fee paid on   26.01.2004 | 29.12.2003 | CY   M02   Fee paid on   26.01.2004 | 29.12.2003 | DE   M02   Fee paid on   26.01.2004 | 29.12.2003 | DK   M02   Fee paid on   26.01.2004 | 29.12.2003 | ES   M02   Fee paid on   26.01.2004 | 29.12.2003 | FI   M02   Fee paid on   26.01.2004 | 29.12.2003 | FR   M02   Fee paid on   26.01.2004 | 29.12.2003 | GB   M02   Fee paid on   26.01.2004 | 29.12.2003 | GR   M02   Fee paid on   26.01.2004 | 29.12.2003 | IE   M02   Fee paid on   26.01.2004 | 29.12.2003 | IT   M02   Fee paid on   26.01.2004 | 29.12.2003 | LU   M02   Fee paid on   26.01.2004 | 29.12.2003 | MC   M02   Fee paid on   26.01.2004 | 29.12.2003 | NL   M02   Fee paid on   26.01.2004 | 29.12.2003 | PT   M02   Fee paid on   26.01.2004 | 29.12.2003 | SE   M02   Fee paid on   26.01.2004 | 29.12.2003 | TR   M02   Fee paid on   26.01.2004 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 29.12.2003 | M02   Fee paid on   23.01.2004 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2010 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1067784 (PACE MICRO TECH PLC [GB]) |