EP1379311 - MICROCATHETER WITH IMPROVED DISTAL TIP AND TRANSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.10.2009 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited The Corporate Centre Bush Hill Bay Street St. Michael / BB | [2008/50] |
Former [2004/03] | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited The Corporate Centre, Bush Hill, Bay Street St. Michael / BB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YE, Ting, Tina 3148 Cortona Drive San Jose, CA 95135 / US | 02 /
SANTOS, Rhoda, M. 4942 Norwich Place Newark, CA 94560 / US | 03 /
LIM, Elaine 5493 Reseda Circle Fremont, CA 94538 / US | 04 /
TRAN, Mai, Xuan 2138 Flintmore Court San Jose, CA 95148 / US | 05 /
DOAN, Hanh 218 Beaumere Way Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | 06 /
NGUYEN, Simon, Ngoc, Huu 2650 Tagart Drive San Jose, CA 95148 / US | [2004/03] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/03] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02764148.9 | 21.03.2002 | [2004/03] | WO2002US08788 | Priority number, date | US20010839065 | 20.04.2001 Original published format: US 839065 | [2004/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02085441 | Date: | 31.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1379311 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1379311 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/00 | [2004/03] | CPC: |
A61M25/0045 (EP,US);
A61L29/085 (EP,US);
A61L29/12 (EP,US);
A61M25/0053 (EP,US);
A61M25/0054 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIKROKATHETER MIT VERBESSERTER DISTALER SPITZE UND ÜBERGÄNGEN | [2008/46] | English: | MICROCATHETER WITH IMPROVED DISTAL TIP AND TRANSITIONS | [2004/03] | French: | MICROCATHETER MUNI D'UN EMBOUT DISTAL AMELIORE ET DE TRANSITIONS | [2004/03] |
Former [2004/03] | MIKROKATHETER MIT VERBESSERTER DISTALER SPITZE UND ÜBERGÄNGE | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.11.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/03] | 05.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.12.2008 | BE | 10.12.2008 | CY | 10.12.2008 | DK | 10.12.2008 | FI | 10.12.2008 | NL | 10.12.2008 | TR | 10.12.2008 | SE | 10.03.2009 | GR | 11.03.2009 | LU | 21.03.2009 | CH | 31.03.2009 | LI | 31.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | PT | 11.05.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
GR | 11.03.2009 | ||
LU | 21.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
GR | 11.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/38] | BE | 10.12.2008 | |
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | BE | 10.12.2008 | |
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
NL | 10.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/25] | FI | 10.12.2008 | |
NL | 10.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4898591 (JANG YUE-TEH [US], et al) [X] 1,19,41 * column 3, line 53 - column 5, line 44; figure - *; | [A]WO9917826 (BOSTON SCIENT LTD [BB], et al) [A] 1,19,41* page 15, line 10 - page 19, line 12; figure - *; | [X]US5951539 (NITA HENRY [US], et al) [X] 1-41 * column W *; | [X]US5961511 (MORTIER TODD J [US], et al) [X] 1,19,41 * column 10, line 8 - line 17; figure - * |