EP1425143 - NON-WOVEN FABRIC PERFORATING DEVICE AND METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corovin GmbH Woltorfer Strasse 124 31224 Peine / DE | [2004/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUTH, Mathias An der Aulenkaut 41 65197 Wiesbaden / DE | 02 /
SODEMANN, Ralf Eulenring 42 31224 Peine / DE | 03 /
ROY, Indra Im Rebhuegel 4 CH-5445 Eggenwil / CH | [2004/49] |
Former [2004/26] | 01 /
MUTH, Mathias An der Eulenkaut 41 65197 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
02 /
SODEMANN, Ralf Eulenring 42 31224 Peine / DE | |||
03 /
ROY, Indra Im Rebhuegel 4 CH-5445 Eggenwil / CH | |||
Former [2004/24] | 01 /
MUTH, Mathias Yorckstrasse 11 65195 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
02 /
SODEMANN, Ralf Eulenring 42 31224 Peine / DE | |||
03 /
ROY, Indra Vor dem Schafskamp 34a 31226 Peine / DE | Application number, filing date | 02764620.7 | 03.07.2002 | [2004/24] | WO2002EP07343 | Priority number, date | DE2001221445U | 03.07.2001 Original published format: DE 20121445 U | [2004/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03004229 | Date: | 16.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1425143 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1425143 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B26F1/24, D04H1/00 | [2004/24] | CPC: |
B32B3/266 (EP,US);
B26F1/20 (KR);
A61F13/512 (EP,US);
B26F1/24 (EP,US);
B32B38/04 (EP,US);
B32B5/022 (US);
B32B5/26 (US);
B32B2038/047 (EP,US);
B32B2398/20 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12361 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12368 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24273 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24281 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24322 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249976 (EP,US);
Y10T442/666 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VLIESPERFORIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG NEBST VERFAHREN | [2004/24] | English: | NON-WOVEN FABRIC PERFORATING DEVICE AND METHOD THEREFOR | [2004/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PERFORATION DE NON-TISSE ET PROCEDE CORRESPONDANT | [2004/24] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/24] | 05.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | EE | 16.03.2005 | FI | 16.03.2005 | GB | 16.03.2005 | IE | 16.03.2005 | NL | 16.03.2005 | SK | 16.03.2005 | BG | 16.06.2005 | GR | 16.06.2005 | SE | 16.06.2005 | AT | 03.07.2005 | CY | 03.07.2005 | LU | 03.07.2005 | BE | 31.07.2005 | MC | 31.07.2005 | PT | 07.09.2005 | [2008/07] |
Former [2007/26] | EE | 16.03.2005 | |
FI | 16.03.2005 | ||
GB | 16.03.2005 | ||
IE | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
SK | 16.03.2005 | ||
BG | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
AT | 03.07.2005 | ||
CY | 03.07.2005 | ||
LU | 03.07.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | EE | 16.03.2005 | |
FI | 16.03.2005 | ||
GB | 16.03.2005 | ||
IE | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
SK | 16.03.2005 | ||
BG | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
AT | 03.07.2005 | ||
CY | 03.07.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2007/11] | EE | 16.03.2005 | |
FI | 16.03.2005 | ||
GB | 16.03.2005 | ||
IE | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
SK | 16.03.2005 | ||
BG | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
AT | 03.07.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 16.03.2005 | |
GB | 16.03.2005 | ||
IE | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
SK | 16.03.2005 | ||
BG | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
AT | 03.07.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 16.03.2005 | |
GB | 16.03.2005 | ||
IE | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
SK | 16.03.2005 | ||
BG | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | FI | 16.03.2005 | |
GB | 16.03.2005 | ||
IE | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
SK | 16.03.2005 | ||
BG | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | FI | 16.03.2005 | |
GB | 16.03.2005 | ||
IE | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
SK | 16.03.2005 | ||
BG | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 16.03.2005 | |
GB | 16.03.2005 | ||
IE | 16.03.2005 | ||
SK | 16.03.2005 | ||
BG | 16.06.2005 | ||
GR | 16.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 16.03.2005 | |
GB | 16.03.2005 | ||
IE | 16.03.2005 | ||
SK | 16.03.2005 | ||
BG | 16.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/01] | FI | 16.03.2005 | |
SK | 16.03.2005 | ||
BG | 16.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | FI | 16.03.2005 | |
BG | 16.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 16.03.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4886632 (VAN ITEN THOMAS P [US], et al) [X] 11-13 * figures 14,15 *; | [A]JPH02216252 (YURI ROLL KK) [A] 1-13* figures 2,3 *; | [A]DE19827567 (COROVIN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-13 * figures 1,4; claim 1 *; | [A]DE19856223 (WAGNER WERNER [ES]) [A] 1-13 * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 23 *; | [X]EP1048419 (BURCKHARDT CHRISTOPH AG [CH]) [X] 8,11-13 * column 4, line 40 - column 6, line 3; figures 1-3 * |