EP1416931 - INHIBITORS OF POLYQ-AGGREGATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Hofgartenstrasse 8 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/24] | For all designated states MAX-PLANCK-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER WISSENSCHAFTEN E.V. Hofgartenstrasse 8 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/20] | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Hofgartenstrasse 8 80539 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÖTTCHER, Henning Stiftstrasse 12 64287 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
HERHAUS, Christian Heidelberger Strasse 55B 64625 Bernsheim / DE | 03 /
BARNICKEL, Gerhard Emilstrasse 27 64293 Darmstadt / DE | 04 /
WANKER, Erich, E. Wolfshagener Str. 85 13187 Berlin / DE | 05 /
HEISER, Volker, c/o Grohmann Dresdner Str. 15 10999 Berlin / DE | 06 /
LEHRACH, Hans Terrassenstr. 31 14129 Berlin / DE | 07 /
BROEKER, Wofgang Lindenhof 1 15831 Mahlow / DE | 08 /
DUNKEL, Ilona Lützelsteiner Weg 52 14195 Berlin / DE | [2004/33] |
Former [2004/30] | 01 /
BÖTTCHER, Henning Stiftstrasse 12 64287 Darmstadt / DE | ||
02 /
HERHAUS, Christian Heidelberger Strasse 55B 64625 Bernsheim / DE | |||
03 /
BARNICKEL, Gerhard Emilstrasse 27 64293 Darmstadt / DE | |||
04 /
WANKER, Erich, E. Leichhardtstrasse 61 14195 Berlin / DE | |||
05 /
HEISER, Volker, c/o Grohmann Dresdner Str. 15 10999 Berlin / DE | |||
06 /
LEHRACH, Hans Terrassenstr. 31 14129 Berlin / DE | |||
07 /
BROEKER, Wofgang Marillenhof 2 15831 Mahlow / DE | |||
08 /
DUNKEL, Ilona Lützelsteiner Weg 52 14195 Berlin / DE | |||
Former [2004/20] | 01 /
BÖTTCHER, Henning Stiftstrasse 12 64287 Darmstadt / DE | ||
02 /
HERHAUS, Christian Heidelberger Strasse 55b 64625 Darmstadt / DE | |||
03 /
BARNICKEL, Gerhard Emilstrasse 27 64293 Darmstadt / DE | |||
04 /
WANKER, Erich, E. Leichhardtstrasse 61 14195 Berlin / DE | |||
05 /
HEISER, Volker, c/o Grohmann Dresdner Str. 15 10999 Berlin / DE | |||
06 /
LEHRACH, Hans Terrassenstr. 31 14129 Berlin / DE | |||
07 /
BROEKER, Wofgang Marillenhof 2 15831 Mahlow / DE | |||
08 /
DUNKEL, Ilona Lützelsteiner Weg 52 14195 Berlin / DE | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/20] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02764704.9 | 17.07.2002 | [2004/20] | WO2002EP07912 | Priority number, date | EP20010118838 | 13.08.2001 Original published format: EP 01118838 | [2004/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03015772 | Date: | 27.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1416931 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1416931 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/425, A61P25/00, A61P43/00 | [2004/20] | CPC: |
A61K31/425 (EP,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
A61K9/0031 (EP,US);
A61K9/0048 (EP,US);
A61K9/02 (EP,US);
A61K9/06 (EP,US);
A61K9/2018 (EP,US);
A61K9/286 (EP,US);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/04 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/12 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
A61P7/08 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HEMMER DER AGGREGATION VON POLYQ | [2004/20] | English: | INHIBITORS OF POLYQ-AGGREGATION | [2004/20] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE POLYQ-AGREGATION | [2004/20] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 09.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.06.2007 | BE | 13.06.2007 | CY | 13.06.2007 | CZ | 13.06.2007 | DK | 13.06.2007 | EE | 13.06.2007 | FI | 13.06.2007 | IT | 13.06.2007 | NL | 13.06.2007 | SK | 13.06.2007 | TR | 13.06.2007 | IE | 17.07.2007 | LU | 17.07.2007 | MC | 31.07.2007 | BG | 13.09.2007 | SE | 13.09.2007 | GR | 14.09.2007 | PT | 13.11.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CY | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
EE | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 17.07.2007 | ||
LU | 17.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CY | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
EE | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 17.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
EE | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 17.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
EE | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 17.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/45] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 17.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
BE | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | SE | 13.09.2007 | Cited in | International search | [XDA]EP0282971 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]) [XD] 1-10 * abstract * * page 2, line 21 - page 4, line 31 * * claims 1-6 * [A] 11-13; | [XA]EP0374041 (RHONE POULENC SANTE [FR]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 2, line 1 - line 29 * * examples 1-17 * * claims 1-8 * [A] 11-13; | [XA]EP0507318 (EISAI CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 3, line 35 - page 4, line 43 * * example 6 * * claims 1-41 * [A] 11-13; | [A]US5348969 (ROMINE JEFFREY L [US], et al) [A] 14-19 * abstract *; | [A]EP0855391 (SNOW BRAND MILK PROD CO LTD [JP]) [A] 11-13 * abstract * * examples 100,101 *; | [XA]US5795903 (CHAPELLE PHILIP [FR], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * column 1, line 7 - line 30 * * claims 1-9 * [A] 11-13; | [XA]WO9965516 (YEDA RES & DEV [IL], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 7, line 10 - line 15 * * page 9, line 32 - page 11, line 34 * * claims 1-3 * [A] 11-13; | [A]WO0073282 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [A] 11-13 * abstract * * claim 11 * * Figure 1, compound 412 *; | [A] - PEREIRA, E R, ET AL., "Syntheses and antimicrobial activities of five-membered ring heterocycles coupled to indole moieties", JOURNAL OF ANTIBIOTICS, (1996), vol. 49, no. 4, pages 380 - 385, XP009003375 [A] 14-19 * the whole document * |