EP1421052 - FLEXIBLE METHOD FOR THE COMMON PRODUCTION OF FORMIC ACID, A CARBOXYLIC ACID HAVING AT LEAST TWO CARBON ATOMS, AND/OR THE DERIVATIVES OF THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.2008 Database last updated on 30.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2007/23] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2004/22] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZEHNER, Peter Erich-Kästner-Str. 15 67071 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
PASTRE, Jörg Grieselstr. 39 64625 Bensheim / DE | 03 /
STÜER, Wolfram Nietzsche Str. 16 68165 Mannheim / DE | [2004/22] | Application number, filing date | 02764771.8 | 24.07.2002 | [2004/22] | WO2002EP08232 | Priority number, date | DE2001138778 | 07.08.2001 Original published format: DE 10138778 | [2004/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03014053 | Date: | 20.02.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1421052 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1421052 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07C51/09, C07C51/56, C07C67/02, C07C53/02, C07C53/12, C07C69/14 | [2004/22] | CPC: |
C07C67/08 (EP,US);
C07C51/09 (EP,KR,US);
C07C45/41 (EP,US);
C07C45/46 (EP,US);
C07C45/89 (EP,US);
C07C51/083 (EP,US);
C07C51/56 (EP,US);
C07C67/00 (EP,US);
C07C67/10 (EP,US);
Y02P20/582 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C45/89, C07C49/90 (US,EP);
C07C51/083, C07C53/08 (US,EP);
C07C51/09, C07C53/02 (US,EP);
C07C51/56, C07C53/12 (US,EP);
C07C67/00, C07C69/01 (EP,US);
C07C67/00, C07C69/15 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLEXIBLES VERFAHREN ZUR GEMEINSAMEN HERSTELLUNG VON AMEISENSÄURE SOWIE EINER CARBONSÄURE MIT MINDESTENS ZWEI KOHLENSTOFFATOMEN UND/ODER DEREN DERIVATEN | [2004/22] | English: | FLEXIBLE METHOD FOR THE COMMON PRODUCTION OF FORMIC ACID, A CARBOXYLIC ACID HAVING AT LEAST TWO CARBON ATOMS, AND/OR THE DERIVATIVES OF THE SAME | [2004/22] | French: | PROCEDE FLEXIBLE DE PRODUCTION SIMULTANEE D'ACIDE FORMIQUE ET D'UN ACIDE CARBOXYLIQUE AYANT AU MOINS DEUX ATOMES DE CARBONE ET/OU LEURS DERIVES | [2004/22] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/22] | 11.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 06.06.2007 | CZ | 06.06.2007 | DK | 06.06.2007 | EE | 06.06.2007 | IE | 06.06.2007 | SK | 06.06.2007 | TR | 06.06.2007 | AT | 24.07.2007 | LU | 24.07.2007 | CH | 31.07.2007 | LI | 31.07.2007 | MC | 31.07.2007 | BG | 06.09.2007 | GR | 07.09.2007 | ES | 17.09.2007 | PT | 06.11.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | CY | 06.06.2007 | |
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
EE | 06.06.2007 | ||
IE | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
AT | 24.07.2007 | ||
LU | 24.07.2007 | ||
CH | 31.07.2007 | ||
LI | 31.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CY | 06.06.2007 | |
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
EE | 06.06.2007 | ||
IE | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
AT | 24.07.2007 | ||
CH | 31.07.2007 | ||
LI | 31.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | CZ | 06.06.2007 | |
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
EE | 06.06.2007 | ||
IE | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
AT | 24.07.2007 | ||
CH | 31.07.2007 | ||
LI | 31.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/50] | CZ | 06.06.2007 | |
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
IE | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
AT | 24.07.2007 | ||
CH | 31.07.2007 | ||
LI | 31.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | CZ | 06.06.2007 | |
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
IE | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
CH | 31.07.2007 | ||
LI | 31.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | CZ | 06.06.2007 | |
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
IE | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | CZ | 06.06.2007 | |
IE | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | CZ | 06.06.2007 | |
IE | 06.06.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | BG | 06.09.2007 | |
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | ES | 17.09.2007 | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP0087870 (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB]) [AD] 1* the whole document *; | [AD]EP0193799 (BASF AG [DE]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP0336216 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [AD] 1 * the whole document * |