EP1423619 - BLIND RIVET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.01.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.03.2006 [2006/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Newfrey LLC 1207 Drummond Plaza Newark Delaware 19711 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/23] | For all designated states Newfrey LLC 1207 Drummond Plaza Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUY, Michael, Paul 193 Abbey Road, Smethwick Warley, West Midlands B67 5NG / GB | [2004/23] | Representative(s) | Haar, Lucas Heinz Jörn, et al haarpatent Patentanwälte Krämer Meyer Goethestraße 2 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/23] | Haar, Lucas H., Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Haar & Schwarz-Haar, Lessingstrasse 3 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 02764851.8 | 15.08.2002 | [2004/23] | WO2002EP09130 | Priority number, date | GB20010020020 | 16.08.2001 Original published format: GB 0120020 | [2004/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03016726 | Date: | 27.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1423619 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16B19/10, B21J15/04 | [2004/23] | CPC: |
F16B5/128 (EP,US);
B21J15/043 (EP,US);
F16B19/008 (EP,US);
F16B19/1054 (EP,US);
F16B2/06 (EP,US);
F16B2/08 (EP,US);
F16B37/14 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/23] | Title | German: | BLINDNIET | [2004/23] | English: | BLIND RIVET | [2004/23] | French: | RIVET AVEUGLE | [2004/23] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/23] | 14.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.08.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/09] | 29.09.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR1302907 (BIERMANN HANS-GEORG;HEIDENWOLF HERMANN) [X] 1,5,8 * figure 1 *; | [X]FR1390540 (OLYMPIC SCREW & RIVET CORP) [X] 1,2,5,7 * figure 2 *; | [X]US3452638 (LAUER HERBERT) [X] 1,2,4-6,9,10,18 * the whole document *; | [X]GB1439812 (VYZK USTAV MECH) [X] 1,2,5,8 * figures 1,3 *; | [X]GB1462409 (MECANO SIMMONDS GMBH) [X] 1-3,9,10,18 * page 2, line 78 - page 3, line 21; figures 4-6 *; | [XA]GB1552235 (UNITED CARR LTD) [X] 10 * page 2, line 73 - line 88; figure 3 *[A] 18; | [X]US4170920 (SIEBOL GEORGE [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7 * figures 6-8 *; | [X]US4904133 (WRIGHT JEWEL L [US]) [X] 1,2,4 * figures 1,2,7 *; | [X]WO9725538 (ALLFAST FASTENING SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4 * figures 1-5 * |