EP1401700 - SADDLE ANTITHEFT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.08.2005 [2005/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cycloblock Entreprise Unipersonnel A Responsabilite Limite 87, Avenue des Vosges 67000 Strasbourg / FR | [2004/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRIBOUT, Michel 87, avenue des Vosges F-67000 Strasbourg / FR | [2004/14] | Representative(s) | Polanz, Lothar Rechtsanwalt Albertstrasse 8 66125 Saarbrücken / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/14] | Polanz, Lothar St.Johanner Strasse 41-43 66111 Saarbrücken / DE | Application number, filing date | 02764945.8 | 05.07.2002 | [2004/14] | WO2002FR02362 | Priority number, date | FR20010008966 | 05.07.2001 Original published format: FR 0108966 | [2004/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03004342 | Date: | 16.01.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1401700 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B62K19/36, B62H5/00 | [2004/14] | CPC: |
B62H5/006 (EP);
B62K19/36 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIEBSTAHLSICHERUNG EINES SATTELS | [2004/14] | English: | SADDLE ANTITHEFT DEVICE | [2004/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF ANTIVOL DE SELLE | [2004/14] | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/14] | 10.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/32] | 07.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]FR2432424 (MICMO) [Y] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US5618052 (RENDALL BARRY A [CA]) [A] 1* column 1, line 54 - line 60; figure -; claim 1 *; | [Y]US5897268 (DEVILLE ANTOINE [FR]) [Y] 1 * figure -; claim - * |