|
13.07.2005 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2005 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2005 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2004 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.12.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.12.2004 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.12.2004 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.10.2004 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
25.10.2004 |
Letter concerning the grant and printing fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (grant procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2004 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
10.05.2004 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2004 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.05.2004 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
18.02.2004 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2004 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.02.2004 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Refund order of filing/examination fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2004 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.12.2003 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
30.12.2003 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
30.12.2003 |
Copy of the international search report |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
30.12.2003 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
30.12.2003 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
24.12.2003 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.12.2003 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.12.2003 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.12.2003 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.12.2003 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.12.2003 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
21.11.2003 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.11.2003 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.11.2003 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.10.2003 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
06.10.2003 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.10.2003 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.10.2003 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
06.10.2003 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
06.10.2003 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
06.10.2003 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
06.10.2003 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.10.2003 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.09.2003 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
08.09.2003 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
08.09.2003 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
08.09.2003 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
08.09.2003 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
9 |
|
04.09.2003 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
14 |
|
14.07.2003 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.07.2003 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
14.07.2003 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
07.06.2003 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.06.2003 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
03.06.2003 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
03.06.2003 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
12.05.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.05.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.04.2003 |
Written opinion - Automated |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
22.03.2003 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.03.2003 |
Invitation to pay prescribed fees together with late payment fee (Rule 58bis PCT) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
24.02.2003 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.02.2003 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
12.02.2003 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.02.2003 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.02.2003 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
05.02.2003 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
02.02.2003 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.01.2003 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.01.2003 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
12.09.2002 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
12.09.2002 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
12.09.2002 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
10 |
|
12.09.2002 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
12.09.2002 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |