EP1468317 - OPTICAL MULTIPLEXER AND DEMULTIPLEXER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QinetiQ Limited Registered Office 85 Buckingham Gate London, SW1E 6PD / GB | [2008/23] |
Former [2004/43] | For all designated states Qinetiq Limited Registered Office, 85 Buckingham Gate London, SW1E 6PD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JENKINS, Richard, M., QinetiQ Malvern Malvern Technology Park, St Andrews Road Malvern, Worcestershire WR14 3PS / GB | [2004/43] | Representative(s) | Yelland, Carl, et al QinetiQ Limited Intellectual Property Malvern Technology Centre St Andrews Road, Malvern Worcestershire WR14 3PS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/30] | Yelland, Carl, et al QinetiQ Limited Intellectual Property Malvern Technology Centre St Andrews Road Malvern Worcestershire WR14 3PS / GB | ||
Former [2007/17] | Bowdery, Anthony Oliver, et al QinetiQ Limited Intellectual Property Malvern Technology Centre St Andrews Road Malvern Worcestershire WR14 3PS / GB | ||
Former [2005/27] | Bowdery, Anthony Oliver, et al QinetiQ Limited Intellectual Property, Cody Technology Park, Ively Road Farnborough, Hants GU14 0LX / GB | ||
Former [2004/43] | Bowdery, Anthony Oliver, et al D/IPD DERA Formalities, A4 Building, Room G016, Ively Road Farnborough, Hants. GU14 OLX / GB | Application number, filing date | 02765107.4 | 08.10.2002 | [2004/43] | WO2002GB04560 | Priority number, date | GB20010025260 | 20.10.2001 Original published format: GB 0125260 | [2004/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03036353 | Date: | 01.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1468317 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1468317 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/293 | [2004/43] | CPC: |
G02B6/12007 (EP,US);
G02B6/2813 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHER MULTIPLEXER UND DEMULTIPLEXER | [2004/43] | English: | OPTICAL MULTIPLEXER AND DEMULTIPLEXER | [2004/43] | French: | MULTIPLEXEUR-DEMULTIPLEXEUR OPTIQUE | [2004/43] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/43] | 28.12.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.06.2008 | BE | 04.06.2008 | CY | 04.06.2008 | CZ | 04.06.2008 | DK | 04.06.2008 | EE | 04.06.2008 | FI | 04.06.2008 | SK | 04.06.2008 | TR | 04.06.2008 | BG | 04.09.2008 | SE | 04.09.2008 | GR | 05.09.2008 | IE | 08.10.2008 | LU | 08.10.2008 | MC | 31.10.2008 | PT | 04.11.2008 | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
BE | 04.06.2008 | ||
CY | 04.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2008 | ||
DK | 04.06.2008 | ||
EE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
TR | 04.06.2008 | ||
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
IE | 08.10.2008 | ||
LU | 08.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
BE | 04.06.2008 | ||
CY | 04.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2008 | ||
DK | 04.06.2008 | ||
EE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
IE | 08.10.2008 | ||
LU | 08.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
BE | 04.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2008 | ||
DK | 04.06.2008 | ||
EE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
IE | 08.10.2008 | ||
LU | 08.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
BE | 04.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2008 | ||
DK | 04.06.2008 | ||
EE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
IE | 08.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/25] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
BE | 04.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2008 | ||
DK | 04.06.2008 | ||
EE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
BE | 04.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2008 | ||
DK | 04.06.2008 | ||
EE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
BE | 04.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2008 | ||
DK | 04.06.2008 | ||
EE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
BE | 04.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2008 | ||
DK | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
BE | 04.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
BE | 04.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 04.06.2008 | |
FI | 04.06.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5410625 (JENKINS RICHARD M [GB], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 1, line 58 - column 7, line 60; figures 1,6 *; | [A]US5563968 (PENNINGS ENGELBERTUS C M [NL], et al) [A] 7 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 6; figures 1,2 * * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 11; figure 4 *; | [DA]US5862288 (TAYAG TRISTAN [US], et al) [DA] 1-6 * column 2, line 4 - line 57; figures 2,3 * * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 36; figure 4 *; | [PA]US2002025102 (OKAYAMA HIDEAKI [JP]) [PA] 1-6* page 1; figure 3 *; | [A] - CHUANG W-C ET AL, "INTEGRATED-OPTICS MULTIMODE-INTERFERENCE WAVELENGTH DIVISION MULTIPLEXER FOR OPTICAL COMMUNICATION", FIBER AND INTEGRATED OPTICS, TAYLOR & FRANCIS, LONDON, GB, (1999), vol. 18, no. 2, ISSN 0146-8030, pages 93 - 104, XP000905967 [A] 1-6 * page 93 - page 96 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/014680399244730 | [A] - EARNSHAW M ET AL, "An optical multiwaveguide interference filter", OPTICS COMMUNICATIONS, NORTH-HOLLAND PUBLISHING CO. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19950501), vol. 116, no. 4, ISSN 0030-4018, pages 339 - 342, XP004011531 [A] 7 * page 339 - page 340 * * page 342 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0030-4018(95)00060-L |