Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7074259 | Global Dossier | 11.07.2006 | B2 | US2004187687 | 30.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CH17012001 | 14.09.2001 | IB0203570 | 02.09.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1429858 | Global Dossier | 23.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CH17012001 | 14.09.2001 | IB0203570 | 02.09.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03024559 | Global Dossier | 27.03.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CH17012001 | 14.09.2001 |