EP1429858 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THERMAL DE-GASSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.09.2007 [2007/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALSTOM Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2004/36] | For all designated states ALSTOM Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states ALSTOM (Switzerland) Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5401 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIEBIG, Erhard Fridolin-Lauber-Strasse 19 86701 Laufenburg / DE | [2004/26] | Application number, filing date | 02765176.9 | 02.09.2002 | [2004/26] | WO2002IB03570 | Priority number, date | CH20010001701 | 14.09.2001 Original published format: CH 170101 | [2004/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03024559 | Date: | 27.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1429858 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B01D19/00, F01K23/10 | [2004/26] | CPC: |
F01K23/106 (EP,US);
B01D19/0005 (EP,US);
Y02E20/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR THERMISCHEN ENTGASUNG | [2004/26] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THERMAL DE-GASSING | [2004/26] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE DEGAZAGE THERMIQUE | [2004/26] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/26] | 01.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/39] | 08.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO8302402 (BRITISH HYDROMECHANICS [GB]) [A] 1* page 5, line 21 - page 6, line L; figure 3 *; | [A]US5476525 (BEKEDAM MARTIN [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 25 - column 4, line 27; figure - * |