EP1411840 - CONSTRICTION DEVICE INCLUDING FIXATION STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.07.2009 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spiration, Inc. 6675 185th Avenue N.E. Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2005/33] |
Former [2004/18] | For all designated states Spiration, Inc. 18109 Northeast 76th Street Redmond, WA 98052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALFERNESS, Clifton, A. 9010 - 258th Avenue NE Redmond, WA 98053 / US | 02 /
BARRY, Robert 13608 - 88th Pl NE Kirkland, WA 98034 / US | 03 /
FINGER, Clint 243 - 165th Ave SE Bellevue, WA 98008 / US | 04 /
SNYDER, Leslie 13814 - 90th Ave NE Kirkland, WA 98034 / US | 05 /
RIMBAUGH, Jenni 304 - 214th St SW Bothell, WA 98021 / US | [2004/18] | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02765820.2 | 09.07.2002 | [2004/18] | WO2002US21688 | Priority number, date | US20010902821 | 10.07.2001 Original published format: US 902821 | [2004/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03005884 | Date: | 23.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1411840 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/12 | [2004/18] | CPC: |
A61B17/00234 (EP,US);
A61B17/12013 (EP,US);
A61B2017/1142 (EP,US);
A61B2017/306 (EP,US);
A61F2/0063 (EP,US);
A61F2/04 (EP,US);
A61F2002/043 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONSTRIKTIONSVORRICHTUNG MIT EINER FIXIERUNGSKONSTRUKTION | [2004/18] | English: | CONSTRICTION DEVICE INCLUDING FIXATION STRUCTURE | [2004/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CONSTRICTION COMPRENANT UNE STRUCTURE DE FIXATION | [2004/18] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2004 | Search fee paid | 12.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/18] | 25.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/36] | 08.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5976158 (ADAMS RONALD DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * the whole document * * columns 1,4,5; figures 1-10 * [Y] 1-12; | [A]US6030392 (DAKOV PEPI [US]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1078601 (SPIRATION INC [US]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0040]; figures 9-12 *; | [A]FR2798838 (INNOTHERA LAB SA [FR]) [A] 1-12* the whole document * | International search | [X]US5976158 (ADAMS RONALD DAVID [US], et al); | [A]US6030392 (DAKOV PEPI [US]); | [AP]US6328689 (GONZALEZ HUGO X [US], et al) |