EP1465801 - HIGH CAPACITY NONCONCENTRIC STRUCTURAL CONNECTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technip France ZAC Danton, 6-8, allée de l'Arche, Faubourg de l'Arche 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2006/46] |
Former [2004/42] | For all designated states Technip France ZAC Danton, 6-8, allée de l'Arche, Faubourg de l'Arche 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUSSELL, Larry, R. 3607 Gramercy Houston, TX 77025-1320 / US | 02 /
ABBOTT, Philip 20511 Manette Dr. Katy, TX 77450 / US | [2004/42] | Representative(s) | Bertrand, Didier Fédit-Loriot 38, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Bertrand, Didier S.A. Fedit-Loriot 38 Avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2004/42] | Bertrand, Didier Cabinet FEDIT-LORIOT 38, Avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02765880.6 | 26.07.2002 | [2004/42] | WO2002US23729 | Priority number, date | US20010916551 | 27.07.2001 Original published format: US 916551 | [2004/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03011682 | Date: | 13.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1465801 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1465801 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B63B1/00 | [2004/42] | CPC: |
B63B3/08 (EP,US);
B63B35/4413 (EP,US);
B63B75/00 (EP,US);
B63B1/048 (EP,US);
B63B2001/044 (EP,US);
B63B2035/442 (EP,US);
B63B2039/067 (EP,US);
F16B21/06 (EP,US);
F16B7/0413 (EP,US);
Y10T403/7045 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | ES, GB, IT [2006/23] |
Former [2004/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NICHTKONZENTRISCHE HOCHLEISTUNGS-KONSTRUKTIONSVERBINDER | [2004/42] | English: | HIGH CAPACITY NONCONCENTRIC STRUCTURAL CONNECTORS | [2004/42] | French: | CONNECTEURS STRUCTURELS NON CONCENTRIQUES A CAPACITE ELEVEE | [2004/42] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/12] | 22.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05022767.7 / EP1625999 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4118135 (COOPER ROY F) [A] 1,2,25,26,39,40* abstract *; | [A]US4971494 (GAUTHIER ALAIN [FR], et al) [A] 1-47 * abstract *; | [A]EP0434978 (MULTI CONTACT AG [CH]) [A] 1-47 * column 3, line 30 - column 7, line 55; figure - *; | [A]US5421676 (WYBRO PIETER G [US], et al) [A] 1,2,7,11,13,15,25,26,30,34,39 * abstract *; | [A]WO9743171 (SAN TAI INTERNATIONAL CORP [US], et al) [A] 1,13,15,25,30,34,39 * page 5, line 29 - page 9, line 15; figure - * |