EP1421156 - FILTER MEDIUM FOR LIQUID FUELS AND FILTER DEVICE UTILIZING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2005 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.10.2005 [2005/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Butenko, Nikolai Ivanovich ul. Proletarskaya, 83 Kherson, 73011 / RU | [2004/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/22] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2005/11] |
Former [2004/22] | Hano, Christian, Dipl.-Ing., et al v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02766699.9 | 08.04.2002 | [2004/22] | WO2002RU00155 | Priority number, date | RU20010111403 | 27.04.2001 Original published format: RU 2001111403 | [2004/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02088278 | Date: | 07.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1421156 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 07.11.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C10G31/09, B01D39/10, B01D39/20, F02M37/22 | [2004/22] | CPC: |
C10G31/09 (EP,US);
B01D39/2068 (EP);
F02M37/34 (EP,US);
F02M37/42 (EP,US);
F02M27/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FILTERMEDIUM FÜR FLÜSSIGBRENNSTOFFE UND FILTERVORRICHTUNG, BEI DEM DIESES ZUR ANWENDUNG KOMMT | [2004/22] | English: | FILTER MEDIUM FOR LIQUID FUELS AND FILTER DEVICE UTILIZING SAME | [2004/22] | French: | MILIEU FILTRANT POUR CARBURANTS LIQUIDES ET DISPOSITIF DE FILTRAGE L'UTILISANT | [2004/22] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2003 | Search fee paid | 27.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: RU | 27.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/22] | 09.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/41] | 18.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]SU1586747 (INST PROBLEM MATERIALOVEDENIA [SU]); | [A]JPS6447450 (DORNIER SYSTEM GMBH); | [A]RU2177073 (ITED [IE], et al); | [A]RU2134238 (GEOL FAKUL TET MGU IM M V LOMO); | [A]RU2038217 (PEVZNER LEV KH [RU], et al) |