EP1427579 - USE OF A POLISHED MOULD IN INJECTION BLOWMOULDING OF SINGLE LAYER METALLOCENE POLYETHYLENE CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/25] | INJECTION BLOW MOULDED SINGLE LAYER METALLOCENE POLYETHYLENE CONTAINER | ||
[2006/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS RESEARCH FELUY Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE | [2006/44] |
Former [2004/51] | For all designated states TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS RESEARCH FELUY Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE | ||
Former [2004/25] | For all designated states ATOFINA Research Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAZIERS, Eric Avenue de la Motte-Baraffe, 52 B-7180 Seneffe / BE | 02 /
SMITS, Valérie Rue du Seigneur 21E 6540 Lobbes / BE | [2006/42] |
Former [2004/25] | 01 /
MAZIERS, Eric Avenue de la Motte-Baraffe, 52 B-7180 Seneffe / BE | ||
02 /
Smits, Valérie Rue du Seigneur 21E 6540 Lobbes / BE | Representative(s) | Leyder, Francis Total Research & Technology Feluy Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Leyder, Francis Total Petrochemicals Research Feluy Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE | ||
Former [2004/25] | Leyder, Francis c/o Fina Research S.A. Dept. Brevets Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE | Application number, filing date | 02767432.4 | 23.08.2002 | [2004/25] | WO2002EP09525 | Priority number, date | EP20010203196 | 24.08.2001 Original published format: EP 01203196 | [2006/42] |
Former [2004/25] | BE20010003196 | 24.08.2001 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03018290 | Date: | 06.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1427579 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1427579 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B29C49/06, B65D1/02, // B29K23:00 | [2004/25] | CPC: |
B29C49/0005 (EP,US);
B29C49/06 (EP,KR,US);
B65D1/0207 (EP,US);
B29C2049/023 (EP);
B29C2949/0715 (EP);
B29C2949/22 (EP,US);
B29C2949/24 (EP,US);
B29C2949/26 (EP,US);
B29C2949/28 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3024 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3032 (EP,US);
B29K2023/06 (EP,US);
B29K2023/0641 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0022 (EP,US);
B29L2031/7158 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1352 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1397 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31855 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31913 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINES POLIERTEN FORMWERKZEUGS IN SPRITZBLASEN VON EINSCHICHTIGEN BEHÄLTERN AUS METALLOCEN-POLYETHYLEN | [2006/15] | English: | USE OF A POLISHED MOULD IN INJECTION BLOWMOULDING OF SINGLE LAYER METALLOCENE POLYETHYLENE CONTAINERS | [2006/14] | French: | UTILISATION D'UN MOULE POLI DANS UN PROCEDE DE SOUFFLAGE PAR INJECTION DE RECIPIENTS A COUCHE UNIQUE EN POLYETHYLENE METALLOCENE | [2006/15] |
Former [2004/25] | SPRITZBLASGEFORMTER EINSCHICHTIGER BEHÄLTER AUS METALLOCEN-POLYETHYLEN | ||
Former [2004/25] | INJECTION BLOW MOULDED SINGLE LAYER METALLOCENE POLYETHYLENE CONTAINER | ||
Former [2004/25] | RECIPIENT EN POLYETHYLENE METALLOCENE A COUCHE UNIQUE ET SOUFFLE PAR INJECTION | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/25] | 14.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.11.2006 | CH | 02.11.2006 | CY | 02.11.2006 | CZ | 02.11.2006 | EE | 02.11.2006 | LI | 02.11.2006 | SK | 02.11.2006 | BG | 02.02.2007 | DK | 02.02.2007 | GR | 03.02.2007 | PT | 02.04.2007 | [2009/38] |
Former [2009/10] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
CH | 02.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2006 | ||
EE | 02.11.2006 | ||
LI | 02.11.2006 | ||
SK | 02.11.2006 | ||
BG | 02.02.2007 | ||
DK | 02.02.2007 | ||
GR | 03.02.2007 | ||
PT | 02.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
CH | 02.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2006 | ||
LI | 02.11.2006 | ||
SK | 02.11.2006 | ||
BG | 02.02.2007 | ||
DK | 02.02.2007 | ||
GR | 03.02.2007 | ||
PT | 02.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
CH | 02.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2006 | ||
LI | 02.11.2006 | ||
SK | 02.11.2006 | ||
BG | 02.02.2007 | ||
DK | 02.02.2007 | ||
PT | 02.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
CH | 02.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2006 | ||
LI | 02.11.2006 | ||
BG | 02.02.2007 | ||
DK | 02.02.2007 | ||
PT | 02.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
CH | 02.11.2006 | ||
LI | 02.11.2006 | ||
BG | 02.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
BG | 02.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | BG | 02.02.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH11171923 ; | [A]JPH11293054 ; | [A]JP2000086833 ; | [A]JP2000313778 ; | [A]US5643646 (SPENCE DAVID R [US]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]US5788926 (ODA YASUHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * example 1 *; | [A]US5858491 (GEUSSENS THEO L V [BE], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 12 *; | [A]JP2000355045 (TAHARA KK) [A] 1 * examples 1-7 *; | [X]WO0123168 (DRUG PLASTICS & GLASS CO [US]) [X] 1-8 * page 2, line 30 - page 4, line 2 * * page 5, line 21 - page 6, line 28; example 1; claims 1-13 *; | [PX]WO0172856 (FINA RESEARCH [BE], et al) [PX] 1-8 * page 12, line 23 - line 31; tables 2,3 *; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990930), vol. 1999, no. 11, & JP11171923 A 19990629 (ASAHI CHEM IND CO LTD) [A] 1,5-8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000131), vol. 2000, no. 01, & JP11293054 A 19991026 (JAPAN POLYCHEM CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2000, no. 26, Database accession no. 2000-298637, XP002188346 & JP2000086833 A 20000328 (ASAHI KASEI KOGYO KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 09, Database accession no. 2001-075018, XP002188347 & JP2000313778 A 20001114 (JAPAN POLYCHEM CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |