EP1436450 - FABRIC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JOHN HEATHCOAT & COMPANY LIMITED Westexe Tiverton Devon EX16 5LL / GB | [2007/14] |
Former [2004/29] | For all designated states JOHN HEATHCOAT & COMPANY LIMITED Westexe Tiverton Devon EX16 5LL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROOCROFT, Brian Thomas 1 Alstone Road, Tiverton Devon EX16 4JL / GB | [2004/29] | Representative(s) | Knowles, James Atherton Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/29] | Knowles, James Atherton Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 02767705.3 | 10.10.2002 | [2004/29] | WO2002GB04597 | Priority number, date | GB20010024267 | 10.10.2001 Original published format: GB 0124267 | [2004/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03031700 | Date: | 17.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1436450 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1436450 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | D02G3/38, D02G3/44, D03D15/10 | [2004/29] | CPC: |
F16G1/28 (EP);
D02G3/32 (EP);
D02G3/447 (EP);
D03D15/58 (EP);
F16G1/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEWEBE | [2004/29] | English: | FABRIC | [2004/29] | French: | TISSU | [2004/29] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 22.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 16.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/11] | Request for further processing for: | 16.02.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 16.02.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.03.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.04.2007 | BE | 04.04.2007 | CH | 04.04.2007 | CY | 04.04.2007 | CZ | 04.04.2007 | DK | 04.04.2007 | EE | 04.04.2007 | FI | 04.04.2007 | LI | 04.04.2007 | NL | 04.04.2007 | SK | 04.04.2007 | TR | 04.04.2007 | BG | 04.07.2007 | SE | 04.07.2007 | GR | 05.07.2007 | PT | 04.09.2007 | IE | 10.10.2007 | LU | 10.10.2007 | MC | 31.10.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CY | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
EE | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
IE | 10.10.2007 | ||
LU | 10.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CY | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
EE | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
IE | 10.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
EE | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
IE | 10.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
IE | 10.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/26] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | CH | 04.04.2007 | |
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | Cited in | International search | [DA]GB837749 (RUSSELL MFG CO) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US4470251 (BETTCHER WILLIAM H [US]) [X] 19,22-24,26,27 * column 1, line 38 - column 2, line 2; figure 1 *; | [X]US4554121 (KRAMERS ALOYSIUS A J [US]) [X] 19,25-27 * column 2, line 1 - column 20 * * column 4, line 15 - line 20 * * column 7, line 25 - line 28 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US5069957 (VANDERMEERSCH EDMOND [BE]) [A] 19,22,24-26 * column 3, line 43 - line 50; figure 3 *; | [A]US5183703 (BERGER JOHANN [DE], et al) [A] 1,14 * the whole document *; | [A]US5296292 (BUTTERS LESLIE C [US]) [A] 19-23 * column 3, line 22 - line 59; figures 2-5 *; | [A]US5527597 (STANHOPE MICHAEL T [US], et al) [A] 1-4,19-21,25-27 * figures 1-2A; claims 1,2 *; | [DA]EP1035353 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [DA] 14* the whole document * |