Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7253295 | Global Dossier | 07.08.2007 | B2 | US2006122411 | 08.06.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US23134102 | 30.08.2002 | US33351106 | 18.01.2006 | US37210402 | 15.04.2002 | US31591701 | 31.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4786866B | Global Dossier | 05.10.2011 | B2 | JP2005504836 | 17.02.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP0208705 | 29.08.2002 | US37210402 | 15.04.2002 | US31591701 | 31.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002330747B | Global Dossier | 19.07.2007 | B2 | Priority number | Date | JP0208705 | 29.08.2002 | US37210402 | 15.04.2002 | US31591701 | 31.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1420794 | Global Dossier | 27.12.2017 | B1 | EP1420794 | 26.05.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP0208705 | 29.08.2002 | US37210402 | 15.04.2002 | US31591701 | 31.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR104392 | 19.07.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US31591701 | 31.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0212233 | 05.10.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | JP0208705 | 29.08.2002 | US37210402 | 15.04.2002 | US31591701 | 31.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2458471 | 31.07.2012 | C | CA2458471 | 17.04.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP0208705 | 29.08.2002 | US37210402 | 15.04.2002 | US31591701 | 31.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA04002006 | 07.06.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | JP0208705 | 29.08.2002 | US37210402 | 15.04.2002 | US31591701 | 31.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ531503 | 27.01.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | JP0208705 | 29.08.2002 | US37210402 | 15.04.2002 | US31591701 | 31.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7064148 | 20.06.2006 | B2 | US2003130352 | 10.07.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US23134102 | 30.08.2002 | US37210402 | 15.04.2002 | US31591701 | 31.08.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03030912 | Global Dossier | 17.04.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37210402 | 15.04.2002 | US31591701 | 31.08.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5568021B | Global Dossier | 06.08.2014 | B2 | JP2011102313 | 26.05.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US37210402 | 15.04.2002 | US31591701 | 31.08.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR036391 | 08.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37210402 | 15.04.2002 | US31591701 | 31.08.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI298256B | 01.07.2008 | B | Priority number | Date | US37210402 | 15.04.2002 | US31591701 | 31.08.2001 |