EP1420794 - PROSTAGLANDIN ANALOGS AS CHLORIDE CHANNEL OPENERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/22] | PROSTAGLANDIN ANALOGS AS CHLORIDE CHANNEL OPENER | ||
[2017/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sucampo AG Baarerstrasse 22 6300 Zug / CH | [2017/52] |
Former [2004/22] | For all designated states Sucampo AG Graben 5 6300 Zug / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UENO, Ryuji 11025 Stanmore Drive, Potomac Montgomery, MD 20854 / US | 02 /
CUPPOLETTI, John 56 Bayham Drive Cincinnati, OH 45218 / US | [2004/22] | Representative(s) | Beckmann, Claus, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [2014/41] |
Former [2014/38] | Adam, Holger, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/22] | Albrecht, Thomas, Dr. Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02767866.3 | 29.08.2002 | [2004/22] | WO2002JP08705 | Priority number, date | US20010315917P | 31.08.2001 Original published format: US 315917 P | US20020372104P | 15.04.2002 Original published format: US 372104 P | [2004/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03030912 | Date: | 17.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1420794 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1420794 | Date: | 27.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/557, C07C405/00 | [2004/22] | CPC: |
C07C405/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/557 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P11/08 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P21/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2017/52] |
Former [2004/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | PROSTAGLANDIN-ANALOGA ALS CHLORIDKANALÖFFNER | [2004/22] | English: | PROSTAGLANDIN ANALOGS AS CHLORIDE CHANNEL OPENERS | [2017/23] | French: | ANALOGUES DE LA PROSTAGLANDINE EN TANT QU'AGENTS D'OUVERTURE DES CANAUX DE CHLORURE | [2017/23] |
Former [2004/22] | PROSTAGLANDIN ANALOGS AS CHLORIDE CHANNEL OPENER | ||
Former [2004/22] | ANALOGUES A LA PROSTAGLANDINE EN TANT QU'AGENTS D'OUVERTURE DES CANAUX DE CHLORURE | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/22] | 19.05.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.06.2006 | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 09.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 19.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 21.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 14.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 17.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.12.2017 | CY | 27.12.2017 | CZ | 27.12.2017 | DK | 27.12.2017 | EE | 27.12.2017 | ES | 27.12.2017 | FI | 27.12.2017 | IT | 27.12.2017 | MC | 27.12.2017 | NL | 27.12.2017 | PT | 27.12.2017 | SE | 27.12.2017 | SK | 27.12.2017 | TR | 27.12.2017 | BG | 27.03.2018 | GR | 28.03.2018 | GB | 29.08.2018 | IE | 29.08.2018 | LU | 29.08.2018 | BE | 31.08.2018 | CH | 31.08.2018 | FR | 31.08.2018 | LI | 31.08.2018 | [2020/30] |
Former [2020/28] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PT | 27.12.2017 | ||
SE | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
TR | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
GB | 29.08.2018 | ||
LU | 29.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
SE | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
TR | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
GB | 29.08.2018 | ||
LU | 29.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
SE | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
GB | 29.08.2018 | ||
LU | 29.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
SE | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LU | 29.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
SE | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LU | 29.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
SE | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
SE | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
SE | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
SE | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
SE | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 27.12.2017 | |
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
SE | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | FI | 27.12.2017 | |
SE | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 27.12.2017 | Cited in | International search | [E]WO02089812 (SUCAMPO AG [CH], et al) [E] 2,4-13,16-28,32,34-43,45 * page 19, line 14 - line 24 * * claims 1-39 *; | [XP]WO0176593 (R TECH UENO LTD [JP]) [XP] 16-19,21,23,25,27,28,46 * claims 1-73 * * page 16, line 16 - line 18 *; | [XP]WO0170233 (R TECH UENO LTD [JP]) [XP] 16-19,21,23,25,27,28,46 * claims 1-57 * * page 17, line 8 - line 10 *; | [XY]EP0979651 (R TECH UENO LTD [JP]) [X] 16-19,21,23,25,27,28,46 * claims 1-58 * * page 5, paragraph 38 * [Y] 2,4-13,32,34-43; | [X]EP0978284 (R TECH UENO LTD [JP]) [X] 16-19,21,23,25,27,28,46 * claims 1-33 * * page 5, paragraph 40 *; | [X]EP0690049 (R TECH UENO LTD [JP]) [X] 16-19,21,23,25,27 * claims 1-28 *; | [X]EP0430552 (UENO SEIYAKU OYO KENKYUJO KK [JP]) [X] 2,4-13,16-19,21,23,25,27,28,32,34,36,38,40,42,43,46 * page 3, lines 1,2 * * page 4, line 20 - page 5, line 42 * * claims 1-8 *; | [X]EP1082961 (TAISHO PHARMA CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 2,4,16-19,32,34 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0310305 (UENO SEIYAKU OYO KENKYUJO KK [JP]) [X] 16-19,21,23,25,27 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2075015 (ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO) [X] 16-19,28 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6015828 (CUPPOLETTI JOHN [US]) [Y] 2,3,32,33 * claims 1-17 *; | [Y] - DAJANI E Z ET AL, "EFFECTS OF E PROSTAGLANDINS, DIPHENOXYLATE AND MORPHINE ON INTESTINAL MOTILITY IN VIVO", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, AMSTERDAM, NL, (197511), vol. 1, no. 34, ISSN 0014-2999, pages 105 - 113, XP001095316 [Y] 2,4-13,32,34-43 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-2999(75)90230-7 | [XD] - DEACHAPUNYA C ET AL, "Regulation of chloride secretion across porcine endometrial epithelial cells by prostaglandin E2.", MEDLINE, (19980401), Database accession no. NLM9490813, XP002227298 [XD] 1,31 * abstract * | [ ] - THE JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY. ENGLAND 1 APR 1998, (19980401), vol. 508 ( Pt 1), ISSN 0022-3751, pages 31 - 47 | [XD] - H. SAKAI ET AL, "A Gastric Housekeeping Cl- Channel Activated via Prostaglandin EP3 Receptor-mediated Ca2+/Nitric Oxide/cGMP Pathway", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19950811), vol. 270, no. 32, pages 18781 - 18785, XP002227295 [XD] 1,31 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.270.32.18781 | [XY] - KA. A. YURKO-MAURO ET AL, "Prostaglandin F2alpha stimulates CFTR activity by PKA- and PKC-dependent phosphorylation", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY-CELL PHYSIOLOGY, (1998), vol. 275, pages C653 - C660, XP002227296 [X] 1,31 * abstract * [Y] 2,3,32,33 | [XDY] - L.N. CHAN ET AL, "Activation of an Adenosine 3' ,5'-Cyclic Monophosphate-Dependent CL- Conductance in Response to Neurohormonal Stimuli in Mouse Endometrial Epithelial Cells: The Role of Cystic Fibrosis Transmembrane Conductance Regulator", BIOLOGY OF REPRODUCTION, (1999), vol. 60, no. 2, pages 374 - 380, XP002227297 [XD] 1,31 * abstract * [Y] 2,3,32,33 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1095/biolreprod60.2.374 | [Y] - DALEMANS W ET AL, "ALTERED CHLORIDE ION CHANNEL KINETICS ASSOCIATED WITH THE AF508 CYSTIC FIBROSIS MUTATION", NATURE, MACMILLAN JOURNALS LTD. LONDON, GB, (19911219), vol. 354, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 526 - 528, XP000611996 [Y] 2,3,32,33 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/354526a0 | Examination | EP0978284 | by applicant | WO02089812 | WO0176593 | WO0170233 | EP0978284 | EP0430552 | EP0310305 | US6015828 | US5073569 | US5166174 | US5221763 | US5212324 | US5739161 | US6242485 | - BIOLOGY OF REPRODUCTION, (1999), vol. 60, no. 2 | - J. PHYSIOL., (1998), vol. 508, pages 31 - 47 | - J. BIOL. CHEM., (1995), vol. 270, no. 32, pages 18781 - 5 | - AM. J. PHYSIOL., vol. 199H, no. Z/B, pages CB5J - 60 | - BIOL. REPROD., (1999), vol. 60, no. 2, pages 374 - 80 | - NATURE, (1991), vol. 354, no. 6354, pages 526 - 8 |