EP1435003 - DIELECTRIC CONSTANT MEASURING APPARATUS AND DIELECTRIC CONSTANT MEASURING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.10.2010 [2010/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8654 / JP | For all designated states Cho, Yasuo 4-5-304, Komegafukuro 2-chome, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi 980-0813 / JP | [2009/46] |
Former [2004/28] | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8654 / JP | ||
For all designated states Cho, Yasuo 4-5-304, Komegafukuro 2-chome, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 980-0813 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHO, Yasuo 4-5-304, Komegafukuro 2-chome, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 980-0813 / JP | 02 /
ONOE, Atsushi, c/o PIONEER CORPORATION Sougou Kenkyusyo, 1-1, Fujimi 6-chome Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama 350-2288 / JP | [2004/28] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/28] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02767936.4 | 10.09.2002 | [2004/28] | WO2002JP09223 | Priority number, date | JP20010274347 | 10.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001274347 | [2004/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03023423 | Date: | 20.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1435003 | Date: | 07.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1435003 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01R27/26 | [2004/28] | CPC: |
G01R27/2635 (EP,US);
G01R27/2676 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/46] |
Former [2004/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIELEKTRIZITÄTSKONSTANTENMESSVORRICHTUNG UND DIELEKTRIZITÄTSKONSTANTENMESSVERFAHREN | [2009/24] | English: | DIELECTRIC CONSTANT MEASURING APPARATUS AND DIELECTRIC CONSTANT MEASURING METHOD | [2004/28] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DE LA CONSTANTE DIELECTRIQUE | [2009/23] |
Former [2004/28] | DIELEKTRIZITÄTSKONSTANTENMESSVORRICHTUNG UND DIELEKTRIZITÄTSKONSTANTEMESSVERFAHREN | ||
Former [2004/28] | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DE LA CONSTANTE DIELECTRIQUE ET LECTEUR/ENREGISTREUR DE DONNEES | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/28] | 19.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]JPH0875806 ; | [X]JPS56107338 ; | [X]GB644426 (IAN IRVINE BOSWELL, et al) [X] 11,16 * page 3, line 43 - page 4, line 62; figures 1-6 *; | [X]US2872529 (HOLLMANN HANS E, et al) [X] 11,13-16,18-20 * column 3, line 36 - column 5, line 15; figures 1-4 *; | [X]US4455638 (WILSON ROBERT M [US]) [X] 11,16 * column 3, line 21 - column 5, line 20; figures 1-4 * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960731), vol. 1996, no. 07, & JP08075806 A 19960322 (MURATA MFG CO LTD;CHO YASUO) [X] 1,4,9 * abstract * [A] 21,22 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19811113), vol. 0051, no. 13, Database accession no. (P - 089), & JP56107338 A 19810826 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 11,16 * abstract * |