EP1417491 - A TEST STRIP FOR A LATERAL FLOW ASSAY FOR A SAMPLE CONTAINING WHOLE CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.08.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ReLia Diagnostics, Inc. 1700 Owens Street, Suite 515 San Francisco, California 94158 / US | [2010/15] |
Former [2004/20] | For all designated states Zhou, Siliang One Market, Suite 1475, Steuart Tower San Francisco, CA 94105 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/20] | Representative(s) | Brasnett, Adrian Hugh, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/20] | Brasnett, Adrian Hugh, et al Mewburn Ellis York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 02768331.7 | 18.07.2002 | [2004/20] | WO2002US23164 | Priority number, date | US20010306660P | 18.07.2001 Original published format: US 306660 P | [2004/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03008933 | Date: | 30.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1417491 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.05.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543, G01N33/52 | [2004/33] | CPC: |
G01N33/558 (EP);
G01N33/54388 (US);
G01N33/525 (EP,US);
G01N33/54366 (EP,US);
Y10S435/97 (EP,US);
Y10T436/25375 (EP,US);
Y10T436/255 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/20] | G01N33/543 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TESTSTREIFEN FÜR EINEN LATERALFLUSS-ASSAY FÜR EINE GANZE ZELLEN ENTHALTENDE PROBE | [2004/20] | English: | A TEST STRIP FOR A LATERAL FLOW ASSAY FOR A SAMPLE CONTAINING WHOLE CELLS | [2004/20] | French: | BANDE D'ESSAI POUR DOSAGE A ECOULEMENT LATERAL D'UN ECHANTILLON RENFERMANT DES CELLULES ENTIERES | [2004/20] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2004 | Search fee paid | 17.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 28.04.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/36] | 22.03.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.04.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 17.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.06.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2005 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   04.10.2005 | 31.07.2009 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   21.09.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4816224 (VOGEL PETER [DE], et al); | [X]US5037736 (FREITAG HELMUT [US], et al); | [X]US5211914 (VOGEL PETER [DE], et al); | [A]WO0062060 (CHIMERA RESEARCH AND CHEMICAL [US]) | International search | [X]US5234813 (MCGEEHAN JOHN K [US], et al); | [X]US5602040 (MAY KEITH [GB], et al); | [X]US5656448 (KANG JEMO [US], et al); | [X]US5712172 (HUANG CHING [US], et al); | [X]US5766552 (DOSHI SONAL R [US], et al); | [X]US5821073 (LEE JIN PO [US]); | [X]WO9918439 (UCB BIOPRODUCTS [BE], et al); | [X]US5985675 (CHARM STANLEY E [US], et al); | [X]US6001658 (FREDRICKSON ROBERT A [CA]) |