EP1425360 - PHOTOLUMINESCENT ADHESIVE TAPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.06.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/24] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CONGARD, Pierre M. 5, Allee des Murgers F-95280 Jouy-Le-Moutier / FR | 02 /
GROSS, Bernd Hauptstrasse 73 40789 Monheim / DE | 03 /
OTTE, Mario Trills 26a 40699 Erkrath / DE | [2004/24] | Representative(s) | Wilhelm, Stefan, et al 3M Deutschland GmbH Office of Intellectual Property Counsel Carl-Schurz-Strasse 1 41453 Neuss / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Wilhelm, Stefan, et al 3M Deutschland GmbH Office of Intellectual Property Counsel Carl-Schurz-Strasse 1 41453 Neuss / DE | ||
Former [2004/24] | Wilhelm, Stefan M., et al 3M Deutschland GmbH Carl-Schurz-Strasse 1 41453 Neuss / DE | Application number, filing date | 02768635.1 | 21.08.2002 | [2004/24] | WO2002US26568 | Priority number, date | EP20010121444 | 07.09.2001 Original published format: EP 01121444 | [2004/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03022951 | Date: | 20.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1425360 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/02, B65H37/04, B65H39/14, B42D5/02 | [2004/24] | CPC: |
B42D5/027 (EP);
C09J7/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHOTOLUMINESZIERENDES KLEBEBAND | [2004/24] | English: | PHOTOLUMINESCENT ADHESIVE TAPE | [2004/24] | French: | RUBAN ADHESIF PHOTOLUMINESCENT | [2004/24] | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 02.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/24] | 03.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/31] | 13.03.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0273997 (INCAS INT CARBON SOLVENT SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-14 * claim 1 *; | [A]DE4107469 (BOEWE SYSTEC AG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * claim 1 * * column 1, line 29 - line 33 *; | [A]US5413532 (RABY JAMES M [US]) [A] 1-14 * column 3, line 24 - line 68 * * figures 1,2 * * column 1, line 35 - line 46 *; | [DA]EP0704510 (YKK CORP [JP]) [DA] 1-14* claims 1,11 *; | [DX]DE19722627 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [DX] 1-3,5,6,9,11-14 * claim - * * page 1, line 31 - line 36 * * page 1, line 46 - line 47 * |