EP1432971 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR NORMALIZATION AND DECONVOLUTION OF ASSAY DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.10.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 30.11.2011 [2011/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Life Technologies Corporation 5823 Newton Drive Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | For all designated states Life Technologies Corporation 5791 Van Allen Way Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | ||
Former [2008/07] | For all designated states INVITROGEN CORPORATION 1600 Faraday Avenue Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | ||
Former [2004/27] | For all designated states Genicon Sciences Corporation 11585 Sorrento Valley Road, Suite 107 San Diego, California 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BODZIN, Leon, J. 11832 Meriden Lane San Diego, CA 92128 / US | 02 /
YGUERABIDE, Juan 9505 Poole Street La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | 03 /
WARDEN, Laurence 12913 Camino Del Valle Poway, CA 92064 / US | 04 /
ANDERSON, Richard, R. 1207 Crest Drive Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | 05 /
RHODES, Kate 13634 Del Poniente Road Poway, CA 92064 / US | [2004/27] | Representative(s) | Williams, Richard Andrew Norman, et al HGF Limited 140 London Wall London EC2Y 5DN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/06] | Williams, Richard Andrew Norman, et al Harrison Goddard Foote 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JA / GB | ||
Former [2006/04] | Couchman, Jonathan Hugh, et al Harrison Goddard Foote, Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | ||
Former [2004/27] | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02768823.3 | 05.09.2002 | [2004/27] | WO2002US28566 | Priority number, date | US20010317543P | 05.09.2001 Original published format: US 317543 P | US20020364962P | 12.03.2002 Original published format: US 364962 P | US20020376049P | 24.04.2002 Original published format: US 376049 P | [2004/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03021231 | Date: | 13.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1432971 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.05.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01N15/02, G01N21/00, G01J3/30, G01J3/40, G01J3/42, G01N33/543 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
G01N21/47 (EP,US);
G01N21/49 (EP,US);
G01N21/554 (EP,US);
G01N33/54346 (EP,US);
G01N33/58 (EP,US);
G01N33/6803 (EP,US);
G01N15/0205 (EP,US);
G01N15/1433 (EP,US);
G01N2015/1472 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/27] | G01N15/02, G01N21/00, G01J3/30, G01J3/40, G01J3/42 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR NORMALISIERUNG UND ENTFALTUNG VON ASSAY-DATEN | [2004/27] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR NORMALIZATION AND DECONVOLUTION OF ASSAY DATA | [2004/27] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR LA NORMALISATION ET LA DECONVOLUTION DE DONNEES DE DOSAGE | [2004/27] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2004 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/27] | 17.05.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/48] | 07.06.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.07.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 11.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/48] | Divisional application(s) | EP10183894.4 / EP2302363 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.02.2008 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 28.06.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 28.06.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9221024 (SIENNA BIOTECH INC [US]) [A] 3 * the whole document *; | [XY]US6214560 (YGUERABIDE JUAN [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 9, line 63 to column 13, line 16; column 24, lines 11-23; column 25, lines 23-28; column 41, lines 33-51; column 53, line 30 to column 55, line 40 * [Y] 2-27; | [Y]US2001002316 (HANSEN W PETER [US], et al) [Y] 2-27 * paragraphs [0044] - [0046] - [0055] - [0062] - [0074]; figure 1 *; | [A] - PASTERNACK R.F., COLLINGS P. J., "Resonance light scattering: A new technique for studying chromophore aggregation", SCIENCE, (19950818), vol. 269, pages 935 - 939, XP002443098 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.7638615 | [A] - GOODMAN S L ET AL, "A REVIEW OF THE COLLOIDAL GOLD MARKER SYSTEM", SCANNING ELECTRON MICROSCOPY. PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL SCANNING ELECTRON MICROSCOPE SYMPOSIUM, CHICAGO, IL, US, (198001), pages 133 - 146, XP000283060 [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - COLLINGS P. J., GIBBS E.J., STARR E.T., VAFEK O., YEE C., POMERANCE L. A., PASTERNACK R. F., "Resonance light scattering and its application in determining the size, shape, and aggregation number for supramolecular assemblies of chromophores", JOURNAL OF PHYSICAL CHEMISTRY B, (19990918), vol. 103, pages 8474 - 8481, XP002443099 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jp991610s | [A] - PASTERNACK R. F., BUSTAMANTE C., COLLINGS P. J., GIANNETTO A., GIBBS E. J., "Porphyrin assemblies on DNA as studied by a resonance light-scattering technique", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAL CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (19930630), vol. 115, pages 5393 - 5399, XP002443100 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00066a006 | International search | [Y]US5498875 (OBREMSKI ROBERT J [US], et al); | [Y]US6122042 (WUNDERMAN IRWIN [US], et al); | [Y]US6180415 (SCHULTZ SHELDON [US], et al) | Examination | - MARIS M A, BROWN C W, "Nonlinear Multicomponent Analysis by Infrared Spectrophotometry", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (19830901), vol. 55, pages 1694 - 1703, XP002000075 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac00261a013 | - KESHAVA N, KEREKES J, MANOLAKIS D, SHAW G, "An Algorithm Taxonomy for Hyperspectral Unmixing", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, (20000424), vol. 4049, pages 42 - 63, XP007909567 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.410362 | - FOGARTY MICHAEL P ET AL, "RATIO METHOD FOR FLUORESCENCE SPECTRAL DECONVOLUTION", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (19810201), vol. 53, no. 2, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 259 - 265, XP007916984 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac00225a031 | - LAHMY S ET AL, "Quantitative microspectrofluorimetry study of the ''blocking effect'' of 6-aminochrysene on benzo[a]pyrene metabolism using single living cells", TOXICOLOGY, LIMERICK, IR, vol. 29, no. 4, doi:10.1016/0300-483X(84)90166-5, ISSN 0300-483X, (19840201), pages 345 - 356, (19840201), XP025512046 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0300-483X(84)90166-5 | by applicant | - CHEWINGS, V. H.; PICKUP, G.; BASTIN, G. N.; PEARCE, G., THE POTENTIAL FOR HYPERSPECTRAL DATA MAPPING IN AUSTRALIAN ARID-ZONE VEGETATION 10TH AUSTRALASIAN REMOTE SENSING AND PHOTOGRAMMETRY CONFERENCE, (2000), pages 851 - 863 |