09.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.06.2008 [2008/24] |
21.12.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] |
13.04.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] |
09.02.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2007 [2007/11] |
24.11.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2006 [2006/52] |
01.09.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2006 [2006/40] |
23.06.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2006 [2006/30] |
14.04.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.05.2006 [2006/22] |
24.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.04.2006 [2006/15] |
03.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.03.2006 [2006/12] |
02.12.2005 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 18.01.2006 [2006/03] |
19.11.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.01.2006 [2006/01] |
04.11.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.12.2005 [2005/51] |
14.10.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.11.2005 [2005/48] |
30.09.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2005 [2005/46] |
10.06.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2005 [2005/30] |
10.12.2004 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 26.01.2005 [2005/04] |
17.11.2004 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
17.11.2004 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
01.10.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.09.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
24.09.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
20.08.2004 |
Change - inventor |
published on 06.10.2004 [2004/41] |
04.08.2004 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.04.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.06.2004 [2004/24] |
23.04.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.06.2004 [2004/24] |
18.03.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.03.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.04.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.04.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.03.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.03.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.12.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.11.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|