22.07.2011 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 24.08.2011 [2011/34] |
01.04.2011 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
22.10.2010 |
First examination report |
|
19.10.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.10.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.04.2010 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 02.06.2010 [2010/22] |
30.04.2010 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.06.2010 [2010/22] |
16.10.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.10.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.10.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.06.2007 |
Change - representative |
published on 11.07.2007 [2007/28] |
20.10.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.06.2006 |
Change - applicant |
published on 02.08.2006 [2006/31] |
20.10.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.12.2004 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
10.12.2004 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
22.10.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.06.2004 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
21.05.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] |
21.05.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] |
14.05.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.05.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.04.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.04.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.10.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.07.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.04.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.04.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.04.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.11.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|