EP1399271 - PROCESS FOR COATING SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington DE 19898 / US | ||
Former [2008/11] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | ||
Former [2004/13] | For all designated states E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REKOWSKI, Volker Im Stengelken 6 D-44892 Bochum / DE | 02 /
REIS, Oliver Thiestrasse 3 58456 Witten / DE | 03 /
WULF, Martin Weststrasse 4 40597 Düsseldorf / DE | [2004/17] |
Former [2004/13] | 01 /
REKOWSKI, Volker Im Stengelken 6 D-44892 Bochum / DE | ||
02 /
REIS, Oliver Thiestrasse 3 58456 Witten / DE | |||
03 /
WULF, Martin Platz der Republik 38 42107 Wuppertal / DE | Representative(s) | Axalta - Biering/Blum/Kimpel Christbusch 25 42285 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/13] | DuPont Performance Coatings Biering/Blum/Kimpel Christbusch 25 42285 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 02769382.9 | 08.05.2002 | [2004/13] | WO2002US14517 | Priority number, date | US20010850711 | 09.05.2001 Original published format: US 850711 | [2004/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02090001 | Date: | 14.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1399271 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1399271 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B05D3/02 | [2004/13] | CPC: |
C09D151/00 (EP,US);
B05D3/0263 (EP,US);
C08F283/00 (EP,US);
C08F291/00 (EP,US);
C08G18/42 (EP,US);
C09D151/08 (EP,US);
C09D175/16 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESCHICHTUNG VON TRÄGERN | [2004/13] | English: | PROCESS FOR COATING SUBSTRATES | [2004/13] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT LE REVETEMENT DE SUBSTRATS | [2004/13] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/13] | 30.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.11.2007 | 18.10.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 15.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 12.03.2008 | IE | 08.05.2008 | LU | 08.05.2008 | MC | 31.05.2008 | GR | 13.06.2008 | PT | 18.08.2008 | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/32] | CY | 12.03.2008 | |
IE | 08.05.2008 | ||
LU | 08.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/42] | CY | 12.03.2008 | |
IE | 08.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | IE | 08.05.2008 | |
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/04] | MC | 31.05.2008 | |
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | PT | 18.08.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0058026 (DU PONT [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 2, line 7 - line 9 * * page 3, line 1 - line 2 * * page 3, line 28 - line 32 * * page 4, line 21 - line 28 * * page 5, line 7 - line 13 * * page 7, line 9 - line 17 ** page 8, line 28 - page 9, line 3 *; | [PX]WO0164794 (BASF COATINGS AG [DE], et al) [PX] 1-11 * page 25, line 26 - line 30 * * page 28, line 16 - line 30 * * example - * * claims 1,2,6,9,10,16 *; | [E]US6432490 (REKOWSKI VOLKER [DE], et al) [E] 1-11 * column 2, line 35 - line 38 * * example - * * claims 2,5 * |