EP1444554 - DISPLAY DEVICE FOR A WRISTWATCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eterna AG Uhrenfabrik Schützengasse 46 2540 Grenchen / CH | [2004/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEYR, Ernst, c/o Eterna AG Uhrenfabrik Schützengasse 46 2540 Grenchen / CH | [2004/33] | Representative(s) | Liebetanz, Michael, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2004/38] | Liebetanz, Michael, Dipl.-Phys., et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Patentanwälte, Postfach 6940 8023 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2004/33] | Isler, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Patentanwälte, Postfach 6940 8023 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 02769834.9 | 04.11.2002 | [2004/33] | WO2002CH00592 | Priority number, date | CH207301 | 12.11.2001 Original published format: CH 207301 | [2004/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03042764 | Date: | 22.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1444554 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1444554 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G04B19/32, G04B19/04 | [2004/33] | CPC: |
G04B19/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/33] | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE ARMBANDUHR | [2004/33] | English: | DISPLAY DEVICE FOR A WRISTWATCH | [2004/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE POUR MONTRE-BRACELET | [2004/33] | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/33] | 01.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 16.12.2009 | CZ | 16.12.2009 | DK | 16.12.2009 | EE | 16.12.2009 | FI | 16.12.2009 | IE | 16.12.2009 | IT | 16.12.2009 | NL | 16.12.2009 | SE | 16.12.2009 | SK | 16.12.2009 | TR | 16.12.2009 | BG | 16.03.2010 | GR | 17.03.2010 | ES | 27.03.2010 | PT | 16.04.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2011/14] | CY | 16.12.2009 | |
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
DK | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IE | 16.12.2009 | ||
IT | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | CY | 16.12.2009 | |
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
DK | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IE | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/48] | CY | 16.12.2009 | |
CZ | 16.12.2009 | ||
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IE | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
GR | 17.03.2010 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | CZ | 16.12.2009 | |
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IE | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
SK | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | CZ | 16.12.2009 | |
EE | 16.12.2009 | ||
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IE | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | EE | 16.12.2009 | |
FI | 16.12.2009 | ||
IE | 16.12.2009 | ||
NL | 16.12.2009 | ||
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
BG | 16.03.2010 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
PT | 16.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/32] | FI | 16.12.2009 | |
SE | 16.12.2009 | ||
ES | 27.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 16.12.2009 | |
SE | 16.12.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4632569 (GOGNIAT PAUL [CH]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [DA]US6208591 (SAKURAZAWA NAOHIKO [JP], et al) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US6266297 (SONODA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 27 * * figure 2A * |