EP1423440 - METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF A MOULDABLE MASS AND USE THEREOF FOR PRODUCTION OF LOW-EMISSION FLOOR COVERINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2006 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 27.06.2007 [2007/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Armstrong DLW AG Stuttgarter Strasse 75 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [2004/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAUK, Hanns-Jörg Dammweg 2 74395 Mundelsheim / DE | 02 /
FISCHER, Bernd Max-Eyth-Strasse 25 74385 Pleidelsheim / DE | 03 /
STEFANI, Renate Lilienweg 4 71739 Oberriexingen / DE | [2004/23] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/23] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02769972.7 | 12.08.2002 | [2004/23] | WO2002EP09018 | Priority number, date | DE2001139738 | 13.08.2001 Original published format: DE 10139738 | [2004/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03016358 | Date: | 27.02.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1423440 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1423440 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/00, C08K5/00 | [2004/23] | CPC: |
C08F8/00 (EP,US);
B29B7/845 (EP,US);
B29B7/86 (EP,US);
B29B7/88 (EP,US);
B29B7/90 (EP,US);
C08K5/0025 (EP,US);
B29B7/48 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F8/00, C08F10/00 (EP,US);
C08K5/0025, C08L23/02 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER FORMBAREN MASSE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EMISSIONSARMER BODENBELÄGE | [2004/23] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF A MOULDABLE MASS AND USE THEREOF FOR PRODUCTION OF LOW-EMISSION FLOOR COVERINGS | [2004/23] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UNE MATIERE MOULABLE ET UTILISATION DANS LA FABRICATION DE REVETEMENTS DE SOLS A FAIBLES EMISSIONS | [2004/23] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/23] | 09.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 23.03.2005 | EE | 23.03.2005 | FI | 23.03.2005 | IE | 23.03.2005 | SK | 23.03.2005 | TR | 23.03.2005 | BG | 23.06.2005 | DK | 23.06.2005 | GR | 23.06.2005 | ES | 04.07.2005 | AT | 12.08.2005 | CY | 12.08.2005 | LU | 12.08.2005 | MC | 31.08.2005 | PT | 07.09.2005 | [2007/26] |
Former [2007/20] | CZ | 23.03.2005 | |
EE | 23.03.2005 | ||
FI | 23.03.2005 | ||
IE | 23.03.2005 | ||
SK | 23.03.2005 | ||
TR | 23.03.2005 | ||
BG | 23.06.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
ES | 04.07.2005 | ||
AT | 12.08.2005 | ||
CY | 12.08.2005 | ||
LU | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2007/11] | CZ | 23.03.2005 | |
EE | 23.03.2005 | ||
FI | 23.03.2005 | ||
IE | 23.03.2005 | ||
SK | 23.03.2005 | ||
TR | 23.03.2005 | ||
BG | 23.06.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
ES | 04.07.2005 | ||
AT | 12.08.2005 | ||
LU | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | CZ | 23.03.2005 | |
FI | 23.03.2005 | ||
IE | 23.03.2005 | ||
SK | 23.03.2005 | ||
TR | 23.03.2005 | ||
BG | 23.06.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
ES | 04.07.2005 | ||
AT | 12.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | CZ | 23.03.2005 | |
FI | 23.03.2005 | ||
IE | 23.03.2005 | ||
SK | 23.03.2005 | ||
BG | 23.06.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
ES | 04.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/15] | CZ | 23.03.2005 | |
FI | 23.03.2005 | ||
IE | 23.03.2005 | ||
SK | 23.03.2005 | ||
BG | 23.06.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
ES | 04.07.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 23.03.2005 | |
IE | 23.03.2005 | ||
SK | 23.03.2005 | ||
BG | 23.06.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
ES | 04.07.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 23.03.2005 | |
IE | 23.03.2005 | ||
SK | 23.03.2005 | ||
BG | 23.06.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/01] | FI | 23.03.2005 | |
SK | 23.03.2005 | ||
BG | 23.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | FI | 23.03.2005 | |
BG | 23.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 23.03.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4578430 (DAVISON SOL [US]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 14 - line 36 * * column 2, line 3 - line 61 * * column 5, line 20 - column 6, line 19; claims 1-7 *; | [A]US4902738 (MITSUNO TATSUYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DD300301 (LEUNA WERKE VEB [DE]) [A] 1 * claims 1-4 *; | [A]US5405915 (HESS KEVIN J [US], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1-10 *; | [A]US5405917 (MUELLER JR FRANCIS X [US], et al) [A] 1* claims 1-16 *; | [Y]US5587434 (MCCULLOUGH JR JAMES D [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * column 4, line 13 - line 67 * * column 5, line 12 - line 32 * * column 6, line 4 - column 7, line 32; claims 1-21 *; | [Y]US5651927 (AUDA RICHARD STEPHEN [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * column 5, line 62 - column 6, line 47 * * column 6, line 57 - column 8, line 17 * * column 8, line 55 - column 9, line 48; claims 1-20 *; | [DY]WO9958602 (DLW AG [DE], et al) [DY] 1-20 * page 3, line 16 - page 6, line 5 * * page 7, line 13 - page 10, line 24; claims 1-18 *; | [A]WO0142401 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [A] 1 * claims 1-6 * |