EP1439630 - RECIPROCATING LINEAR ACTUATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Electric Works Co., Ltd. 1048 Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka / JP | [2009/08] |
Former [2004/30] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJIWARA, Makoto c/o MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS, LTD. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | 02 /
NAKAYAMA, Satoshi c/o MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS, LTD. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | 03 /
SANEMATSU, Wataru c/o MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS, LTD. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | [2010/15] |
Former [2004/30] | 01 /
FUJIWARA, M., c/o MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS, LTD. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | ||
02 /
NAKAYAMA, S., c/o MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS, LTD. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | |||
03 /
SANEMATSU, W., c/o MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS, LTD. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | Representative(s) | Mackenzie, Andrew Bryan, et al Scott & York Intellectual Property Limited 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/50] | Mackenzie, Andrew Bryan, et al Scott & York Intellectual Property Limited 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans, Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | ||
Former [2004/30] | Mackenzie, Andrew Bryan, et al Marks & Clerk 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans, Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | Application number, filing date | 02770288.5 | 28.10.2002 | [2004/30] | WO2002JP11182 | Priority number, date | JP20010329936 | 26.10.2001 Original published format: JP 2001329936 | [2004/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03036780 | Date: | 01.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1439630 | Date: | 21.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1439630 | Date: | 11.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.05.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H02K33/02 | [2004/30] | CPC: |
H02K33/16 (EP,US);
H02K33/02 (EP,KR,US);
H02K41/03 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REZIPROKIERENDER LINEARAKTUATOR | [2010/15] | English: | RECIPROCATING LINEAR ACTUATOR | [2004/30] | French: | ACTIONNEUR LINEAIRE A MOUVEMENT ALTERNATIF | [2004/30] |
Former [2004/30] | LINEARES PENDELSTELLGLIED | Entry into regional phase | 05.04.2004 | Translation filed | 13.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2004 | Search fee paid | 13.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 13.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/30] | 16.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.08.2010 | BE | 11.08.2010 | CY | 11.08.2010 | CZ | 11.08.2010 | DK | 11.08.2010 | EE | 11.08.2010 | FI | 11.08.2010 | NL | 11.08.2010 | SE | 11.08.2010 | SK | 11.08.2010 | TR | 11.08.2010 | IE | 28.10.2010 | LU | 28.10.2010 | CH | 31.10.2010 | LI | 31.10.2010 | MC | 31.10.2010 | FR | 02.11.2010 | BG | 11.11.2010 | GR | 12.11.2010 | ES | 22.11.2010 | PT | 13.12.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 11.08.2010 | |
BE | 11.08.2010 | ||
CY | 11.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2010 | ||
DK | 11.08.2010 | ||
EE | 11.08.2010 | ||
FI | 11.08.2010 | ||
NL | 11.08.2010 | ||
SE | 11.08.2010 | ||
SK | 11.08.2010 | ||
IE | 28.10.2010 | ||
LU | 28.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FR | 02.11.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
ES | 22.11.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 11.08.2010 | |
BE | 11.08.2010 | ||
CY | 11.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2010 | ||
DK | 11.08.2010 | ||
EE | 11.08.2010 | ||
FI | 11.08.2010 | ||
NL | 11.08.2010 | ||
SE | 11.08.2010 | ||
SK | 11.08.2010 | ||
IE | 28.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FR | 02.11.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
ES | 22.11.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 11.08.2010 | |
BE | 11.08.2010 | ||
CY | 11.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2010 | ||
DK | 11.08.2010 | ||
EE | 11.08.2010 | ||
FI | 11.08.2010 | ||
NL | 11.08.2010 | ||
SE | 11.08.2010 | ||
SK | 11.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FR | 02.11.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
ES | 22.11.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 11.08.2010 | |
BE | 11.08.2010 | ||
CY | 11.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2010 | ||
DK | 11.08.2010 | ||
EE | 11.08.2010 | ||
FI | 11.08.2010 | ||
NL | 11.08.2010 | ||
SE | 11.08.2010 | ||
SK | 11.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
ES | 22.11.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/24] | AT | 11.08.2010 | |
BE | 11.08.2010 | ||
CY | 11.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2010 | ||
DK | 11.08.2010 | ||
EE | 11.08.2010 | ||
FI | 11.08.2010 | ||
NL | 11.08.2010 | ||
SE | 11.08.2010 | ||
SK | 11.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 11.08.2010 | |
BE | 11.08.2010 | ||
CY | 11.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2010 | ||
DK | 11.08.2010 | ||
EE | 11.08.2010 | ||
FI | 11.08.2010 | ||
NL | 11.08.2010 | ||
SE | 11.08.2010 | ||
SK | 11.08.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 11.08.2010 | |
BE | 11.08.2010 | ||
CY | 11.08.2010 | ||
DK | 11.08.2010 | ||
FI | 11.08.2010 | ||
NL | 11.08.2010 | ||
SE | 11.08.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 11.08.2010 | |
BE | 11.08.2010 | ||
CY | 11.08.2010 | ||
FI | 11.08.2010 | ||
NL | 11.08.2010 | ||
SE | 11.08.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 11.08.2010 | |
CY | 11.08.2010 | ||
FI | 11.08.2010 | ||
NL | 11.08.2010 | ||
SE | 11.08.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
GR | 12.11.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 11.08.2010 | |
CY | 11.08.2010 | ||
FI | 11.08.2010 | ||
NL | 11.08.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | AT | 11.08.2010 | |
FI | 11.08.2010 | ||
NL | 11.08.2010 | ||
BG | 11.11.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 11.08.2010 | |
FI | 11.08.2010 | ||
NL | 11.08.2010 | ||
PT | 13.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 11.08.2010 | |
NL | 11.08.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5351490 (OHISHI TATSURU [JP], et al) [A] 1,14* figures 1-3 *; | [X]JPH07313746 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [X] 1-4,7,8,11,15 * abstract *; | [X]US5632087 (MOTOHASHI RYO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,7,8,11,15 * column 3, lines 25-47; figures 5,6 * | International search | [Y]WO9526261 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]); | [A]US5557850 (MUN KUG H [KR]); | [A]DE19531013 (BRAUN AG [DE]); | [Y]JPH08322225 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [Y]JPH11136920 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) |