EP1447130 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURE OF CATALYST ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/34] | CATALYST ELEMENT AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURE THEREOF | ||
[2009/34] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Insulators, Ltd. 256, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 467-8530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/04] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 256, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 467-8530 / JP | ||
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 256, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 467-8530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJII, Misako 201, Sky Plaza Shonan, 2591, Enzo Chihgasaki-shi, Kanagawa 253-0084 / JP | 02 /
MORIMOTO, Kenji, NGK INSULATORS, LTD 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | 03 /
KAWASAKI, Shinji, NGK INSULATORS, LTD 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | [2004/34] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/34] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 02770291.9 | 29.10.2002 | [2004/34] | WO2002JP11189 | Priority number, date | JP20010357920 | 22.11.2001 Original published format: JP 2001357920 | [2004/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03043733 | Date: | 30.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1447130 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/34] | Type: | A9 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1447130 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | [2004/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1447130 | Date: | 27.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.05.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/58, B01J35/02, B01J35/00 | [2007/35] | CPC: |
B01J35/40 (EP,US);
B01D53/885 (EP,US);
B01J21/14 (EP,US);
B01J23/58 (EP,US);
B01J35/19 (EP,US);
B01J35/56 (EP,US);
B01J37/0009 (EP,US);
B01J37/0018 (EP,US);
C04B35/185 (EP,US);
C04B35/195 (EP,US);
C04B35/6306 (EP,US);
C04B35/6365 (EP,US);
C04B38/0006 (EP,US);
B01J21/12 (EP,US);
B01J37/038 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00129 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3201 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3206 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3217 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3218 (EP,US);
C04B2235/322 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3232 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3244 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3279 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3289 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3445 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3463 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3481 (EP,US);
C04B2235/349 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3826 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3873 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5436 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5463 (EP,US);
C04B2235/80 (EP,US);
Y10T428/131 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24149 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24157 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24165 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24744 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B38/0006, C04B35/195 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/34] | B01J23/58, B01J35/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2010/04] |
Former [2004/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR KATALYSATORELEMENT | [2009/34] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURE OF CATALYST ELEMENT | [2009/34] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN ELEMENT DE CATALYSE | [2009/34] |
Former [2004/34] | KATALYSATORELEMENT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2004/34] | CATALYST ELEMENT AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURE THEREOF | ||
Former [2004/34] | ELEMENT DE CATALYSE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE CET ELEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2004 | Translation filed | 24.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2004 | Search fee paid | 24.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/34] | 21.11.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.07.2009 | 16.07.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.07.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.07.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 07.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4033779 (WINKLER ERNEL R); | [X]US4295892 (MATSUHISA TADAAKI [JP], et al); | [X]EP0393565 (CORNING INC [US]); | [A]EP1153649 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]); | [PX]WO02070433 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP], et al); | EP1364928 [ ] (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) | International search | [A]JPH0283254 (INAX CORP); | [A]WO0030995 (CORNING INC [US]); | [A]JP2001232195 (NGK INSULATORS LTD); | [AP]JP2002059009 (NIPPON SOKEN, et al) | by applicant | US4033779 | US4295892 | EP0393565 | WO0030995 | EP1364928 |