EP1399209 - VENTILATOR PATIENT SYNCHRONIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ResMed Limited 1 Elizabeth Macarthur Drive Bella Vista, NSW 2153 / AU | [2016/33] |
Former [2006/39] | For all designated states ResMed Limited 1 Elizabeth Macarthur Drive Bella Vista NSW 2153 / AU | ||
Former [2004/13] | For all designated states Resmed Ltd. 97 Waterloo Road North Ryde, NSW 2113 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREEN, Paul, Anthony 20 Waimea Road Lindfield, New South Wales 2070 / AU | 02 /
BASSIN, David, John 52 Dolphin Street Coogee, New South Wales 2034 / AU | [2004/13] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2016/33] |
Former [2012/09] | Frhr.Schenck zu Schweinsberg, Elard Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/13] | Hagmann-Smith, Martin Peter Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South Oxford, Oxfordshire OX4 2RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 02771608.3 | 22.05.2002 | [2004/13] | WO2002AU00639 | Priority number, date | US20010292983P | 23.05.2001 Original published format: US 292983 P | [2004/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02094358 | Date: | 28.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1399209 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1399209 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 28.11.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/00 | [2004/13] | CPC: |
A61M16/0069 (EP,US);
A61M16/0051 (US);
A61M16/024 (EP);
A61M2016/0027 (EP,US);
A61M2016/0039 (EP,US);
A61M2230/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2016/33] |
Former [2004/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | SYNCHRONISATION DER BEATMUNG EINES PATIENTEN | [2004/13] | English: | VENTILATOR PATIENT SYNCHRONIZATION | [2004/13] | French: | SYNCHRONISATION D'UN RESPIRATEUR AVEC LA RESPIRATION D'UN PATIENT | [2004/13] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2003 | Search fee paid | 23.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/13] | 27.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.08.2016 | BE | 17.08.2016 | CY | 17.08.2016 | DK | 17.08.2016 | ES | 17.08.2016 | FI | 17.08.2016 | IT | 17.08.2016 | MC | 17.08.2016 | NL | 17.08.2016 | TR | 17.08.2016 | GR | 18.11.2016 | PT | 19.12.2016 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 17.08.2016 | |
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9211054 (PURITAN BENNETT CORP [US]) [X] 2-11,13,17-18 * page 21, line 29 - page 23, line 35; figures 16,17 * * page 6, line 25 - page 10, line 28; figures 3-7 * [I] 12; | [XI]US5438980 (PHILLIPS STEVEN L [US]) [X] 2-11,13,17-18 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 50; figures 1,2 * [I] 12; | [XDI]WO9812965 (RESMED LTD [AU]) [XD] 2-11,13,17-18 * page 5, line 7 - line 11; tables 1,2 * * page 13, line 6 - page 17, line 9; figures 1a-1b * [I] 12; | [A]WO0045702 (REES STEPHEN EDWARD [DK], et al) [A] 2,12* page 12, line 25 - page 23, line 27; figures 1-9 *; | [XI]WO0119440 (RESMED LTD [AU], et al) [X] 2-11,13,17 * page 6, line 2 - page 10, line 18; figures 1,2 * [I] 12 | International search | [A]WO9812965 (RESMED LTD [AU]); | [A]WO0119440 (RESMED LTD [AU], et al); | [A]EP0956877 (SIEMENS ELEMA AB [SE]); | [A]WO9308857 (RESPIRONICS INC [US]) | by applicant | AU9700631 | WO9812965 |