EP1425640 - MONITORING SYSTEM AND A METHOD FOR THE IN-PROCESS MONITORING OF MACHINE-TOOL COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.10.2007 [2007/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kluft, Werner Ellerstrasse 43 D-52078 Aachen / DE | [2004/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/24] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/24] | Dallmeyer, Georg, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 02772284.2 | 10.09.2002 | [2004/24] | WO2002EP10121 | Priority number, date | DE2001144459 | 10.09.2001 Original published format: DE 10144459 | [2004/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03023327 | Date: | 20.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1425640 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1425640 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/46] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1425640 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | [2007/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/406 | [2004/24] | CPC: |
G05B19/4065 (EP,US);
G05B2219/37577 (EP,US);
G05B2219/37616 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2006/46] |
Former [2004/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR PROZESSBEGLEITENDEN ÜBERWACHUNG VON WERKZEUGMASCHINEN-KOMPONENTEN | [2007/24] | English: | MONITORING SYSTEM AND A METHOD FOR THE IN-PROCESS MONITORING OF MACHINE-TOOL COMPONENTS | [2004/24] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE SERVANT A SURVEILLER DES COMPOSANTS DE MACHINES-OUTILS, LORS DU DEROULEMENT DE PROCESSUS | [2004/24] |
Former [2004/24] | ÜBERWASCHENGSSYSTEM SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR PROZESSBEGLEITENDEN ÜBERWACHUNG VON WERKZEUGMASCHINEN-KOMPONENTEN | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/24] | 14.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0321108 (PRVNI BRNESNSKA STROJIRNA KONC [CS]) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 33 - column 6, line 53 *; | [A]EP0762248 (FORD MOTOR CO [GB], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [XA]US6138056 (HARDESTY MICHAEL P [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 52 - line 55; figures 1,2 * [A] 3-42 |