EP1415283 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR FORMAL GUARANTEE OF A PAYMENT, USING A PORTABLE TELEPHONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.01.2007 [2007/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Crédit Lyonnais 18, rue de la République 69002 Lyon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states Credit Lyonnais 18, rue de la République 69002 Lyon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASSUERUS, Frédéric River Side, 74, rue Camille Claudel F-78955 Carrières sous Poissy / FR | 02 /
BERGSTEN, Ulrik 17, rue Louis Maurice F-94210 La Varenne / FR | [2004/19] | Representative(s) | Grynwald, Albert, et al SCHMIT CHRETIEN 16, rue de la Paix 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/51] | Grynwald, Albert, et al Cabinet Grynwald 94, rue Saint Lazare 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2004/19] | Grynwald, Albert, et al Cabinet Grynwald, 127, rue du Faubourg Poissonnière 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02772450.9 | 24.07.2002 | [2004/19] | WO2002FR02658 | Priority number, date | FR20010009903 | 25.07.2001 Original published format: FR 0109903 | FR20010009904 | 25.07.2001 Original published format: FR 0109904 | [2004/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03010721 | Date: | 06.02.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1415283 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1415283 | Date: | 15.02.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G07F7/08, G07F19/00 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
G06Q20/3829 (EP);
G06Q20/326 (EP,US);
G06Q20/02 (EP);
G06Q20/04 (EP);
G06Q20/12 (EP);
G06Q20/341 (EP);
G06Q20/355 (EP);
G06Q20/363 (EP);
G06Q20/38215 (EP);
G06Q20/385 (EP);
G06Q20/388 (EP);
G07F7/0866 (EP);
G07F7/1008 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/19] | G07F7/08 | Designated contracting states | FR [2006/07] |
Former [2004/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR FORMALEN GARANTIE, MITTELS EINES MOBILTELEFONS, FÜR EINE BEZAHLUNG | [2004/19] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR FORMAL GUARANTEE OF A PAYMENT, USING A PORTABLE TELEPHONE | [2004/19] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME PERMETTANT DE GARANTIR FORMELLEMENT UN PAIEMENT, EN METTANT EN OEUVRE UN TELEPHONE PORTABLE | [2004/19] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/31] | 24.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/04] | Request for further processing for: | 07.04.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 07.04.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.04.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6016476 (MAES STEPHANE HERMAN [US], et al) [A] 1,7 * column 9, line 65 - column 10, line 21 ** figures 1,4 *; | [A]WO0017794 (VISA INT SERVICE ASS [US], et al) [A] 1,7 * page 20, line 10 - page 21, line 18 * * page 22, line 7 - line 26 * * figures 1,2,5,6 *; | [A]EP1061484 (CITICORP DEV CT INC [US]) [A] 1,7 * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0026] * * figures 1,4,5,7A *; | [A]WO0139085 (KLOOR HARRY THOMAS [US]) [A] 1-8,12 * page 6, line 29 - line 34 * * page 8, line 5 - page 11, line 11 * * claims 1,3,5,6,8,11,17 * * figures 2,3,5,9 * |