EP1438315 - IMPROVED PRECURSORS FOR CHEMICAL VAPOUR DEPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EPICHEM LIMITED Power Road, Bromborough Wirral Merseyside CH62 3QF / GB | [2006/39] |
Former [2004/30] | For all designated states Epichem Limited Power Road, Bromborough Wirral, Merseyside CH62 3QF / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JONES, Anthony Copeland Rose Tree Cottage, Georgian Close, Eccleston Park Prescot, Merseyside L35 7JW / GB | [2004/30] | Representative(s) | Lees, Kate Jane, et al Roystons Tower Building Water Street Merseyside Liverpool L3 1BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/30] | Lees, Kate Jane, et al Roystons, Tower Building, Water Street Merseyside, Liverpool L3 1BA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02772548.0 | 25.10.2002 | [2004/30] | WO2002GB04822 | Priority number, date | GB20010025724 | 26.10.2001 Original published format: GB 0125724 | GB20010029080 | 04.12.2001 Original published format: GB 0129080 | [2004/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03035926 | Date: | 01.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1438315 | Date: | 21.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1438315 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07F7/00, C07F5/00, C23C16/18, C23C16/40, C07C31/28 | [2004/30] | CPC: |
C07F5/003 (EP,US);
C07F7/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORLAEUFERVERBINDUNGEN FÜR CHEMISCHE DAMPFPHASENABSCHEIDUNG | [2004/30] | English: | IMPROVED PRECURSORS FOR CHEMICAL VAPOUR DEPOSITION | [2004/30] | French: | PRECURSEURS AMELIORES POUR DEPOT CHIMIQUE EN PHASE VAPEUR | [2004/30] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/30] | 14.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.09.2006 | CH | 27.09.2006 | CY | 27.09.2006 | CZ | 27.09.2006 | EE | 27.09.2006 | FI | 27.09.2006 | LI | 27.09.2006 | SK | 27.09.2006 | TR | 27.09.2006 | LU | 25.10.2006 | MC | 31.10.2006 | BG | 27.12.2006 | DK | 27.12.2006 | GR | 28.12.2006 | ES | 07.01.2007 | PT | 13.03.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
CH | 27.09.2006 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2006 | ||
EE | 27.09.2006 | ||
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
LI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
TR | 27.09.2006 | ||
LU | 25.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
GR | 28.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
CH | 27.09.2006 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2006 | ||
EE | 27.09.2006 | ||
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
LI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
GR | 28.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
CH | 27.09.2006 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2006 | ||
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
LI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
GR | 28.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
CH | 27.09.2006 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2006 | ||
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
LI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
CH | 27.09.2006 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2006 | ||
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
IT | 27.09.2006 | ||
LI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
CH | 27.09.2006 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2006 | ||
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
LI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
CZ | 27.09.2006 | ||
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CZ | 27.09.2006 | |
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/12] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | FI | 27.09.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0614867 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1-17* the whole document *; | JP2002069641 [ ] (ASAHI DENKA KOGYO KK); | [X] - BHARARA, P. C. ET AL, "Reactions of titanium alkoxides with (methylamino) alcohols", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19740610), vol. 80, no. 23, Database accession no. 132732, XP002236947 [X] 1-17 * abstract * | [X] - ONOSAWA, KAZUHISA ET AL, "Source material for CVD and deposition of thin film using the source material", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 136:239948 CA, URL: STN, XP002236948 [X] 1-17 * abstract * | Examination | WO9514698 |