EP1441681 - CHAIRS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.2006 [2006/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jenx Limited Nutwood 28, Limestone Cottage Lane Sheffield S6 1NS / GB | [2004/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JENKINS, Clive 7 Hollow Meadow Mews, Manchester Road Sheffield S6 6GY / GB | [2004/32] | Representative(s) | Chapman, Paul Nicholas Atkinson & Company Intellectual Property Limited 7 Moorgate Road Rotherham South Yorkshire S60 2EN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/37] | Chapman, Paul Nicholas Atkinson Burrington Limited 28 President Buildings President Way Sheffield S4 7UR / GB | ||
Former [2004/32] | Atkinson, Ralph, et al Atkinson Burrington 28 President Buildings President Way Sheffield S4 7UR / GB | Application number, filing date | 02772622.3 | 06.11.2002 | [2004/32] | WO2002GB05019 | Priority number, date | GB20010026818 | 08.11.2001 Original published format: GB 0126818 | [2004/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03039428 | Date: | 15.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1441681 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61G5/10 | [2004/32] | CPC: |
A61G5/1059 (EP,US);
A61G5/1075 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STUHL | [2004/32] | English: | CHAIRS | [2004/32] | French: | CHAISES | [2004/32] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/32] | 31.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/48] | 11.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE410119 (PAUL CIECIERSKI) [A] 1,2,5 * the whole document *; | [A]US1527754 (SIMON SYLVESTER J) [A] 1,5-7 * page 4, line 80 - line 111; figures 1,2 *; | [XY]GB1301595 (STEEPER) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3; | [A]US4165127 (VAGO ROBERT E) [A] 1 * column 5, line 57 - line 61; figure - *; | [XA]AU1740383 (WRIGLEY D F) [X] 1 * page 5, line 6 - line 9; figures 1,5 * [A] 2-6,8; | [A]GB2125285 (PHILLIPS TERENCE) [A] 1-6,8 * abstract *; | [A]US4732423 (CONDON JAMES R [US]) [A] 1,4,5 * column 2, line 21 - line 64; figure - *; | [Y]NL1005550C (LOPITAL NEDERLAND B V [NL]) [Y] 2,3 * page 2, line 34 - line 39; figure - *; | [PX]WO0187219 (BORRINGIA IND AG [CH], et al) [PX] 1-4 * page 3, line 24 - page 4, line 23; figure 1 *; | [PX]GB2369566 (JCM SEATING SOLUTIONS LTD [GB]) [PX] 1-4* page 18, line 22 - page 19, line 17; figure - * |