EP1420943 - CURING MACHINE FOR PRODUCING TIRES FOR ROAD VEHICLES AND THE LIKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.09.2007 [2007/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIMA IMPIANTI S.p.A. Via Gora e Barbatole 192 I-51100 Pistoia / IT | [2004/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GALIGANI, Tiziano Via Fiorentina, 458 I-51032 Pistoia / IT | 02 /
BROGI, Daniele Via del Cornocchio, 19 I-50031 Barberino Mugello / IT | 03 /
CAPECCHI, Massimo Via Gora e Barbatole, 200 I-51100 Pistoia / IT | [2004/22] | Representative(s) | Mannucci, Michele, et al Ufficio Tecnico Ing.A. Mannucci S.r.l. Via della Scala 4 50123 Firenze / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/22] | Mannucci, Michele, et al Ufficio Tecnico Ing.A. Mannucci S.R.L, Via della Scala 4 50123 Firenze / IT | Application number, filing date | 02772806.2 | 19.08.2002 | [2004/22] | WO2002IT00542 | Priority number, date | IT2001FI00160 | 24.08.2001 Original published format: IT FI20010160 | [2004/22] | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03018301 | Date: | 06.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1420943 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1420943 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B29D30/06 | [2004/22] | CPC: |
B29D30/0603 (EP,US);
B29D30/06 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VULKANISIERVORRICHTUNG FÜR FAHRZEUGLUFTREIFEN UND DERGLEICHEN | [2004/22] | English: | CURING MACHINE FOR PRODUCING TIRES FOR ROAD VEHICLES AND THE LIKE | [2004/22] | French: | APPAREIL DE VULCANISATION POUR LA PRODUCTION DE ROUES DE VEHICULES TERRESTRES ET SIMILAIRES | [2004/22] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2003 | Translation filed | 01.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/22] | 16.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.05.2005 | BE | 25.05.2005 | CH | 25.05.2005 | EE | 25.05.2005 | FI | 25.05.2005 | IT | 25.05.2005 | LI | 25.05.2005 | NL | 25.05.2005 | SK | 25.05.2005 | TR | 25.05.2005 | CY | 19.08.2005 | IE | 19.08.2005 | BG | 25.08.2005 | DK | 25.08.2005 | GR | 25.08.2005 | SE | 25.08.2005 | DE | 26.08.2005 | MC | 31.08.2005 | ES | 05.09.2005 | PT | 27.10.2005 | [2007/39] |
Former [2007/20] | AT | 25.05.2005 | |
BE | 25.05.2005 | ||
CH | 25.05.2005 | ||
EE | 25.05.2005 | ||
FI | 25.05.2005 | ||
LI | 25.05.2005 | ||
NL | 25.05.2005 | ||
SK | 25.05.2005 | ||
TR | 25.05.2005 | ||
CY | 19.08.2005 | ||
IE | 19.08.2005 | ||
BG | 25.08.2005 | ||
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
DE | 26.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
ES | 05.09.2005 | ||
PT | 27.10.2005 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 25.05.2005 | |
BE | 25.05.2005 | ||
CH | 25.05.2005 | ||
EE | 25.05.2005 | ||
FI | 25.05.2005 | ||
LI | 25.05.2005 | ||
NL | 25.05.2005 | ||
SK | 25.05.2005 | ||
TR | 25.05.2005 | ||
IE | 19.08.2005 | ||
BG | 25.08.2005 | ||
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
DE | 26.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
ES | 05.09.2005 | ||
PT | 27.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 25.05.2005 | |
BE | 25.05.2005 | ||
CH | 25.05.2005 | ||
FI | 25.05.2005 | ||
LI | 25.05.2005 | ||
NL | 25.05.2005 | ||
SK | 25.05.2005 | ||
TR | 25.05.2005 | ||
IE | 19.08.2005 | ||
BG | 25.08.2005 | ||
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
DE | 26.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
ES | 05.09.2005 | ||
PT | 27.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT | 25.05.2005 | |
BE | 25.05.2005 | ||
CH | 25.05.2005 | ||
FI | 25.05.2005 | ||
LI | 25.05.2005 | ||
NL | 25.05.2005 | ||
SK | 25.05.2005 | ||
IE | 19.08.2005 | ||
BG | 25.08.2005 | ||
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
DE | 26.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
ES | 05.09.2005 | ||
PT | 27.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/35] | AT | 25.05.2005 | |
BE | 25.05.2005 | ||
CH | 25.05.2005 | ||
FI | 25.05.2005 | ||
LI | 25.05.2005 | ||
NL | 25.05.2005 | ||
SK | 25.05.2005 | ||
BG | 25.08.2005 | ||
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
DE | 26.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
ES | 05.09.2005 | ||
PT | 27.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/31] | AT | 25.05.2005 | |
BE | 25.05.2005 | ||
CH | 25.05.2005 | ||
FI | 25.05.2005 | ||
LI | 25.05.2005 | ||
NL | 25.05.2005 | ||
SK | 25.05.2005 | ||
BG | 25.08.2005 | ||
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
ES | 05.09.2005 | ||
PT | 27.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 25.05.2005 | |
BE | 25.05.2005 | ||
CH | 25.05.2005 | ||
FI | 25.05.2005 | ||
LI | 25.05.2005 | ||
NL | 25.05.2005 | ||
BG | 25.08.2005 | ||
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
ES | 05.09.2005 | ||
PT | 27.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 25.05.2005 | |
BE | 25.05.2005 | ||
CH | 25.05.2005 | ||
FI | 25.05.2005 | ||
LI | 25.05.2005 | ||
NL | 25.05.2005 | ||
BG | 25.08.2005 | ||
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
ES | 05.09.2005 | ||
PT | 27.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 25.05.2005 | |
BE | 25.05.2005 | ||
CH | 25.05.2005 | ||
FI | 25.05.2005 | ||
LI | 25.05.2005 | ||
BG | 25.08.2005 | ||
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
ES | 05.09.2005 | ||
PT | 27.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 25.05.2005 | |
BE | 25.05.2005 | ||
FI | 25.05.2005 | ||
BG | 25.08.2005 | ||
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 25.05.2005 | |
SE | 25.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 25.08.2005 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS57148638 ; | [A]GB1177617 (PIRELLI [IT]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [XY]US4236883 (TURK LEONARD G, et al) [X] 1,2,5,7-9 * column 4, line 15 - line 44; figures 1,2 * * column 8, line 41 - line 64; figures 9-12 * * column 10, line 12 - line 16 * [Y] 3,4,6; | [Y]US4452577 (IRIE NOBUHIKO [JP]) [Y] 3 * figure 5 *; | [A]US4547012 (KREBS GERD [DE]) [A] 1-3* the whole document *; | [A]US4606714 (NIXON BRYAN E [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US4950142 (KATAYAMA HIDEAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US5127811 (TRETHOWAN JACK [GB]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]US5776508 (IRIE NOBUHIKO [JP]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 006, no. 253, & JP57148638 A 19820914 (SUMITOMO) [Y] 4,6 * abstract * |