EP1457515 - RESIN COMPOSITION PREPREG LAMINATED SHEET AND SEMICONDUCTOR PACKAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.08.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.09.2007 [2007/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO., LTD. 5-8, Higashi-Shinagawa 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/38] | For all designated states SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO., LTD. 5-8, Higashi-Shinagawa 2-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOSOMI, Takeshi, Sumitomo Bakelite Company Limited 5-8, Higashi-shinagawa 2-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | 02 /
YAMASHITA, Masako E-201, 7, Sanaicho Joetsu-shi, Niigata 942-0031 / JP | 03 /
BABA, Takayuki, Sumitomo Bakelite Company Limited 5-8, Higashi-shinagawa 2-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | 04 /
YABUKI, Kentaro 1288, Kanbayashi Soja-shi, Okayama 719-1123 / JP | [2004/38] | Representative(s) | Solf, Alexander Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/38] | Solf, Alexander, Dr. Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02772828.6 | 30.08.2002 | [2004/38] | WO2002JP08845 | Priority number, date | JP20010264385 | 31.08.2001 Original published format: JP 2001264385 | [2004/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03018675 | Date: | 06.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1457515 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.03.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/24, H05K1/03, C08L101/00, C08L63/00, C08L79/00 | [2004/48] | CPC: |
H05K1/0373 (EP,KR,US);
C08J5/241 (KR);
C08J5/24 (EP);
C08J5/244 (US);
C08J5/249 (KR);
H05K1/0366 (EP,KR,US);
H05K2201/0209 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T428/24917 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249924 (EP,US);
Y10T428/259 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/38] | C08J5/24, // H05K1:03,(C08L101/00, 63:00, 79:00) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG, PREPREG, LAMINATFOLIE UND HALBLEITERBAUSTEIN | [2004/38] | English: | RESIN COMPOSITION PREPREG LAMINATED SHEET AND SEMICONDUCTOR PACKAGE | [2004/38] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RESINE, PREIMPREGNE, FEUILLE LAMINEE, ET BOITIER DE SEMI-CONDUCTEUR | [2004/38] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2004 | Translation filed | 18.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2004 | Search fee paid | 18.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 01.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/38] | 24.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4309473 (MINAMISAWA TSUYOSHI, et al) [X] 1-5,8,13-16* column W * | International search | [X]JPS61209234 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [Y]JPS62169828 (TEIJIN LTD); | [Y]JPH01245038 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [X]JPH0952941 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO); | [X]JPH09136943 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS); | [Y]JPH11158752 (ASAHI SCHWEBEL CO LTD); | [Y]JPH11181123 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO); | [Y]JP2000344862 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO); | [Y]JP2001081305 (ASAHI KASEI CORP); | [X]JP2001156461 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO); | [XP]JP2002172736 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [AE]JP2002309085 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO) |