EP1436065 - METHOD OF PLATINUM PARTICLES RECOVERY FROM REACTION GAS IN THE PROCESS OF NITRIC ACID PRODUCTION AND GRANULAR COMPOSITE MATERIAL FOR RECOVERY OF SUCH PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.04.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.05.2007 [2007/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pryvatna Firma "SIT" vul. Barnaulska, 27 Kharkiv, 61013 / UA | [N/P] |
Former [2004/29] | For all designated states privatna Firma "SIT" vul. Barnauska, 27 Kharkov, 61013 / UA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAVRENKO, Antonina Oleksandrivna ul. Zhovtneva, 5-3 Kharkov, 61003 / UA | 02 /
LOBOYKO, Oleksiy Yakovych ul. Klochkovska, 154a-85 Kharkov, 61145 / UA | 03 /
GRYN, Grygoriy Ivanovych Saltivske Shosse, 250a-99 Kharkov, 61178 / UA | 04 /
FEDORCHENKO, Tetyana Viktorivna vul. Koshkina,.4,.kv.201 m.Kharkiv, 61037 / UA | 05 /
KOZUB, Pavlo Anatoliyovych ul. Barnaulska, 27 Kharkiv, 61013 / UA | [2004/41] |
Former [2004/29] | 01 /
LAVRENKO, Antonina Oleksandrivna ul. Zhovtneva, 5-3 Kharkov, 61003 / UA | ||
02 /
LOBOYKO, Oleksiy Yakovych ul. Klochkovska, 154a-85 Kharkov, 61145 / UA | |||
03 /
GRYN, Grygoriy Ivanovych Saltivske Shosse, 250a-99 Kharkov, 61178 / UA | |||
04 /
FEDORCHENKO, Tetyana Viktorivna ul. Pushkina, 4-201 Kharkov, 61037 / UA | |||
05 /
KOZUB, Pavlo Anatoliyovych ul. Barnaulska, 27 Kharkiv, 61013 / UA | Representative(s) | SONN Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/29] | Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 02773136.3 | 19.08.2002 | [2004/29] | WO2002UA00035 | Priority number, date | UA20010085833 | 20.08.2001 Original published format: UA 01085833 | [2004/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03015888 | Date: | 27.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1436065 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 12.09.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/04, B01D49/00, B01D46/30, B01J20/04 | [2004/29] | CPC: |
B01J20/041 (EP,US);
B01J20/046 (EP,US);
B01J20/2803 (EP,US);
B01J20/3007 (EP,US);
B01J20/3078 (EP,US);
C01B21/267 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR RÜCKGEWINNUNG VON PLATINTEILCHEN AUS REAKTIONSGAS BEI DER HERSTELLUNG VON SALPETERSÄURE UND GRANULATZUSAMMENSETZUNGSMATERIAL ZUR RÜCKGEWINNUNG SOLCHER TEILCHEN | [2004/29] | English: | METHOD OF PLATINUM PARTICLES RECOVERY FROM REACTION GAS IN THE PROCESS OF NITRIC ACID PRODUCTION AND GRANULAR COMPOSITE MATERIAL FOR RECOVERY OF SUCH PARTICLES | [2004/29] | French: | PROCEDE POUR RECUPERER DES PARTICULES DE PLATINE A PARTIR D'UN GAZ REACTIONNEL LORS D'UN PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'ACIDE NITRIQUE ET MATERIAU COMPOSITE GRANULAIRE UTILISE POUR RECUPERER DE TELLES PARTICULES | [2004/29] | Entry into regional phase | 03.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 03.04.2004 | Search fee paid | 03.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: RU | 03.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 31.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/19] | 20.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.04.2004 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   03.04.2004 | 03.04.2004 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   03.04.2004 | 03.04.2004 | BG   M01   Fee paid on   03.04.2004 | 03.04.2004 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   03.04.2004 | 03.04.2004 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   03.04.2004 | 03.04.2004 | CZ   M01   Fee paid on   03.04.2004 | 03.04.2004 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   03.04.2004 | 03.04.2004 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   03.04.2004 | 03.04.2004 | EE   M01   Fee paid on   03.04.2004 | 03.04.2004 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   03.04.2004 | 03.04.2004 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   03.04.2004 | 03.04.2004 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   03.04.2004 | 03.04.2004 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   03.04.2004 | 03.04.2004 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   03.04.2004 | 03.04.2004 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   03.04.2004 | 03.04.2004 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   03.04.2004 | 03.04.2004 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   03.04.2004 | 03.04.2004 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   03.04.2004 | 03.04.2004 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   03.04.2004 | 03.04.2004 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   03.04.2004 | 03.04.2004 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   03.04.2004 | 03.04.2004 | SK   M01   Fee paid on   03.04.2004 | 03.04.2004 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   03.04.2004 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 03.04.2004 | M01   Fee paid on   03.04.2004 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2000070669 ; | [X]JPS59162927 ; | [X]GB830674 (CHEMIE LINZ AG) [X] 1,2* claim - *; | [X]WO0132296 (FOSTER WHEELER ENERGIA OY [FI]) [X] 2 * claim 1 * * page 1, line 12 - line 34 * * page 2, line 19 - line 22 * * page 19, line 33 - page 20, line 7 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000922), vol. 2000, no. 06, & JP2000070669 A 20000307 (HITACHI ZOSEN CORP) [X] 2 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850118), vol. 0090, no. 12, Database accession no. (C - 261), & JP59162927 A 19840913 (HITACHI ZOSEN KK) [X] 2 * abstract * | International search | [A]SU1720706 (MO KHIM T I IM MENDELEEVA [SU]); | [A]SU1699597 (MO KHIM T I IM MENDELEEVA [SU]); | [A]SU1787520 ; | [A]SU567487 (KARAVAEV M M [SU], et al); | [A]SU1353501 (DOMAREV ANATOLIJ P [SU], et al); | [A]RU2006285 (N PROIZV OB EDINENIE EMEKAT [RU]) |